Carr v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Frances Carr
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation, Ethicon Incorporated and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv01194
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting the stipulation of dismissal (Doc. #67 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims in the above-captioned case are dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs and attorneys' fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all hearings and deadlines are vacated, and all pending motions, including the motion at Doc. #42 , are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/1/2020. (WLP)
June 30, 2020 Filing 67 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Bradley)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion to withdraw (Doc. #65 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that attorneys Christy D. Jones, David B. Thomas, Melissa A. Merk, Susan M. Robinson, Rebecca L. Trela, and William M. Gage are withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson in this matter. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/19/2020. (WLP)
June 19, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION to Withdraw Counsel for Defendants Ethicon, Inc. & Johnson & Johnson by Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS ETHICON, INC. AND JOHNSON & JOHNSON)(Johnston, Bradley)
June 19, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley James Johnston on behalf of Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson. (Johnston, Bradley)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: This action was recently transferred to this Court from the Southern District of West Virginia. (Doc. #61 .) The parties are ordered to meet and confer and then file a joint notice by July 1, 2020 that (1) identifies all motions in this action that are pending and in need of a ruling, (2) addresses whether the pending summary judgment motion should be resolved first, and (3) addresses whether, in light of Plaintiff's failure to respond to the summary judgment motion, Plaintiff still intends to pursue this action [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/17/20. (MAW)
June 17, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christopher A Gomez, Lee B Balefsky on behalf of Plaintiff Frances Carr. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 16, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE Re Transfer of 2:15-cv-05206 from the Southern District of West Virginia to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-20-1194-PHX-DWL. (MAP)
June 16, 2020 Filing 61 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-05206 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
June 10, 2020 Filing 60 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6860) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6965) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7143) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/11/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 59 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (6824) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (6998) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (7100) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/11/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 58 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2076) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2098) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2140) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2253) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6820) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6969) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7099) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/11/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 57 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (6876) Pls Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6877) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (7020) Part 1 Defs' Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (7020) Part 2 Defs' Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/11/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 56 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2270) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2271) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2284) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2313) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2820) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2821) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2890) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3033) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6854) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6964) - Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7156) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/11/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 55 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6821) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6958) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7177) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/11/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 54 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1996) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1997) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2167) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2222) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2814) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2816) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2950) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3011) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6825) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6957) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7179) - Defs' Reply in Support of Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/11/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 53 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2200) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 5 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 6 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (6648) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (6833) - Amended Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (6926) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (7123) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/11/2020 to add party filer)(msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 52 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 21 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/11/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 51 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3621) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6875) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (7038) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7045) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7085) - Amended Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7183) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/11/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 50 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2251) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/11/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 49 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/11/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 6/12/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 6/11/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/29/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying #21 MOTION AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with PTO 303 or Alternatively to Showcause for Failure to Comply with PTO 303 and Request for Expedited Briefing. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/28/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER The #22 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum for Failure to Comply With PTO #303 or Alternatively to Show Cause for Failure to Comply with PTO #303 and Request for Expedited Briefing is GRANTED in part as molded in the Order and otherwise is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/22/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER (Dismissing Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation with Prejudice and Transferring Cases to MDL 2327) granting the Joint Motion by Boston Scientific Corporation to Dismiss With Prejudice filed in MDL 2326; Defendant BSC is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as a defendant in the actions listed in Exhibit A; the Clerk is directed to disassociate the civil actions as member cases in MDL 2326 and re-associate them with MDL 2327. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Richard L. Luciani on November 12, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #42 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Testimony Disclosures. (Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF FRIENDS AND FAMILY by Boston Scientific Corporation of all friends and family members identified in the Plaintiff Fact Sheet, including section VI. Fact Witnesses, and/or identified during the Plaintiff's deposition on dates and at times to be determined. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Veronica Nohaba on October 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Sam Carr on October 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Noel Lawson on October 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Nick Carr on October 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Laura Carr on October 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Gina Karst on October 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Diana Reyman on October 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Angela Oviedor on October 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Alex Carr on October 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Withdraw #23 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Dismiss With Prejudice, and denying as moot #23 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Dismiss With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/27/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Withdraw #23 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2326 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2326 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2326 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE by Frances Carr in opposition to #23 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
August 13, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #25 Notice. CORRECTION: Image is a duplicate of the image attached to entry #24. CORRECTION: Duplicate image removed. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 25 DUPLICATE IMAGE; SEE ENTRY #24. (Modified on 8/13/2018 to remove image as a duplicate of the image attached to entry #24) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Failure to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with PTO 303 or Alternatively for Plaintiffs to Show Cause for Failure to Comply with PTO 303 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, B & C)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum for Failure to Comply With PTO #303 or Alternatively to Show Cause for Failure to Comply with PTO #303 and Request for Expedited Briefing. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with PTO 303 or Alternatively to Showcause for Failure to Comply with PTO 303 and Request for Expedited Briefing (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER The #18 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or Alternatively for Plaintiffs to Show Cause for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or for Alternative Relief, Request for Expedited Briefing is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/14/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: Cases Listed on Appendix A & B) (brn) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or Alternatively for Plaintiffs to Show Cause for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or for Alternative Relief, Request for Expedited Briefing and Supporting Memorandum (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Rebecca L. Trela on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Trela, Rebecca) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Frances Carr on May 17, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Frances Carr on May 17, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of #9 Notice of Videotaped Deposition (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Frances Carr on 4/3/2018 at 1:30 p.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
February 14, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Farshid Sadeghi on 3/22/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Frances Carr. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
July 15, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 11, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
June 8, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
May 29, 2015 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman on 5/29/2015. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 5/27/2015, answer due 7/27/2015. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
May 29, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
April 28, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 125 (Fourth Amended Docket Control Order on Wave 1 and Wave 2 Discovery)entered on 04/27015 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]
April 27, 2015 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3857469. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lab) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Jon A Strongman
Represented By: Michael A Tanenbaum
Represented By: James H Keale
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Incorporated
Represented By: Rebecca L Trela
Represented By: Melissa A Merk
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: Levi Trent Claridge
Represented By: Bradley James Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Rebecca L Trela
Represented By: Melissa A Merk
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: Levi Trent Claridge
Represented By: Bradley James Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Carr
Represented By: Michelle L Tiger
Represented By: Lee B Balefsky
Represented By: Christopher A Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?