Seliverstova v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Elina Seliverstova
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv01235
Filed: June 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Elina Seliverstova: Certificate of Mailing re: Summons & Complaint upon Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration (USPS does not indicate date of delivery - shows in transit). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt & USPS Tracking Report)(Adamo, Frankie) *Modified on 8/10/2020 (WLP).
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Elina Seliverstova: Certificate of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon US Attorney on 06/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(Adamo, Frankie)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Elina Seliverstova: Certificate of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon US Attorney General on 07/01/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(Adamo, Frankie)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 *NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Carol Clark appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Clark, Carol) *Modified text on 7/8/2020 (WLP).
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carol Clark appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Sachelari, Paul)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Errata re: #6 Summons Issued by the Clerk. Notice of Errata by Plaintiff Elina Seliverstova.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Summons)(Adamo, Frankie)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER - See document for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/23/2020. (WLP)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 22, 2020. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/23/2020. (WLP)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, Attorney General, U.S. Attorney for the District of Arizona. (WLP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/23/2020. (WLP)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-1235-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Elina Seliverstova. (Adamo, Frankie) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Elina Seliverstova. (Adamo, Frankie) (BAC)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Elina Seliverstova. (Adamo, Frankie) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seliverstova v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elina Seliverstova
Represented By: Frankie James Adamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Carol Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?