Wayne et al v. Loelke et al
Plaintiff: Unknown Parties and Buddy Wayne
Defendant: Elizabeth Loelke, Food 2828 LLC, Green Outlet LLC, Elizabeth Yi, Yilolife Incorporated, JJ Empire LLC, Carsten Loelke and Natural Relief Clinic Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv01244
Filed: June 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Referring Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this Order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying all pending motions as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this matter on August 31, 2020 without further leave of Court. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/31/2020. (WLP)
July 31, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement by Food 2828 LLC, Green Outlet LLC, JJ Empire LLC, Carsten Loelke, Elizabeth Loelke, Natural Relief Clinic Incorporated. (Wilenchik, Dennis)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall complete and file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or to pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to either pay the $400.00 filing fee or file a non-prisoner Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to mail Plaintiff a court-approved non-prisoner Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs form. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP) (WLP)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/29/2020. (REK)
July 29, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G. Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-1244-PHX-GMS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. See document for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 7/23/2020. (WLP)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Buddy Wayne. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (MAP)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (WLP)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Buddy Wayne. (2 pages) (WLP)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (styled as a handwritten note) by Buddy Wayne. (1 page) (WLP)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01244-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 MAG25 Instructions)(WLP)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Buddy Wayne. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type, not all caps. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Buddy Wayne. (9 pages) (WLP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wayne et al v. Loelke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Loelke
Represented By: Dennis Ira Wilenchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food 2828 LLC
Represented By: Dennis Ira Wilenchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Outlet LLC
Represented By: Dennis Ira Wilenchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Yi
Represented By: Dennis Ira Wilenchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yilolife Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJ Empire LLC
Represented By: Dennis Ira Wilenchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carsten Loelke
Represented By: Dennis Ira Wilenchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natural Relief Clinic Incorporated
Represented By: Dennis Ira Wilenchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buddy Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?