Xponential Fitness et al v. Arizona, State of et al
Plaintiff: Xponential Fitness, AKT Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Yoga Six Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC and Row House Franchise LLC
Defendant: Arizona, State of, Douglas A Ducey, Cara M Christ and Arizona Department of Health Services
Case Number: 2:2020cv01310
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Referring Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting the #61 Motion. Plaintiffs will file a single brief in opposition to Defendants' pending Motions to Dismiss (Doc. #58 ; Doc. #60 ), not to exceed 30 pages, on or before September 18, 2020. Defendants will file their reply briefs on or before October 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/20/2020. (LFIG)
August 19, 2020 Filing 61 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint by AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Howie, Brian)
August 13, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Joinder by Arizona Department of Health Services, Arizona, State of, Cara M Christ. (Falls, Gregory)
August 5, 2020 Filing 59 *REPORT/NOTICE of Settlement Talks/Discussions by AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC . (Howie, Brian) *Modified to correct event and text on 8/6/2020 (REK).
August 5, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Douglas A Ducey. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE AND CERTIFICATION OF CONFERRAL REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Johnson, Brett)
August 5, 2020 Filing 57 Second MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Douglas A Ducey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brett)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 10/6/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/28/2020. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: On July 8, 2020, Defendant Ducey filed a Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) (Doc. #37 ). Plaintiffs then filed a First Amended Complaint pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) (Doc. #49 ). In light of the First Amended Complaint, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #37 ) is denied as moot. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/28/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
July 27, 2020 Filing 54 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, First Amended Complaint, Notice of Filing upon Arizona Department of Health Services on July 23, 2020. (Howie, Brian)
July 27, 2020 Filing 53 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, First Amended Complaint, Notice of Filing upon Dr. Cara Christ on July 23, 2020. (Howie, Brian)
July 23, 2020 Filing 52 Summons Issued as to Arizona Department of Health Services, Cara M Christ. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 22, 2020 Filing 51 SUMMONS Submitted by AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC. (Howie, Brian)
July 22, 2020 Filing 50 SUMMONS Submitted by AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC. (Howie, Brian)
July 22, 2020 Filing 49 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief, Injunctive Relief and Damages against All Defendants filed by PB Franchising LLC, AKT Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, Yoga Six Franchise LLC, Row House Franchise LLC.(Howie, Brian)
July 22, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Howie, Brian)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #21 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant State of Arizona's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #34 ) is GRANTED. Arizona shall be dismissed as a party from this suit. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/14/2020. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
July 14, 2020 Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Douglas A Ducey for proceedings held on 7/13/2020, Judge Diane J Humetewa hearing judge(s). (Johnson, Brett)
July 13, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER proceedings held on 07/13/2020, before Judge DIANE J. HUMETEWA. [Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7249]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2020. (RAP)
July 13, 2020 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC for proceedings held on July 13, 2020, Judge Diane J Humetewa hearing judge(s). (Howie, Brian)
July 13, 2020 Filing 43 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Diane J Humetewa: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on 7/13/2020. Arguments heard. IT IS ORDERED taking this matter under advisement. Order to follow. TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES: Brian Howie, Jeffrey Logan, Steven Swaney and Alex Weingarten for Plaintiffs. Brunn Roysden for Defendant State of Arizona. Michael Calvanico, Derek Flint, Anni Foster and Brett Johnson for Defendant Governor Doug Ducey. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.) Hearing held 10:00 AM to 11:16 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Plaintiffs and Governor Ducey each ask this Court to take judicial notice of various documents, including Governor Ducey's COVID-19 Executive Orders; statements made by State, Federal and WHO officials; and statistical data. (Docs. #22 , #36 ). The Court finds these documents to be proper subjects of judicial notice. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Judicial Notice (Doc. #22 ) and Governor Ducey's Motion for Judicial Notice (Doc. #36 ) are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that oral argument on Plaintiffs' TRO Motion set for 7/13/2020 at 10:00 AM shall be limited to thirty (30) minutes per side, and rebuttal, if any, shall be limited to fifteen (15) minutes. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/10/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
July 10, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Howie, Brian)
July 9, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Celeste M Brecht on behalf of Plaintiffs AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, and Yoga Six Franchise LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 8, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Errata re: #39 Response to Motion by Defendant Douglas A Ducey. (Johnson, Brett)
July 8, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re: #21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Douglas A Ducey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E, #2 Exhibit Exhibits F-I)(Johnson, Brett)
July 8, 2020 Filing 38 *NOTICE/ Certification of Conferral re: #37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Douglas A Ducey . (Johnson, Brett) *Modified to add document link on 7/9/2020 (REK).
July 8, 2020 Filing 37 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Douglas A Ducey. (Johnson, Brett) *Modified to correct motion type on 7/9/2020 (REK).
July 8, 2020 Filing 36 *MOTION for Judicial Notice and Memorandum in Support by Douglas A Ducey . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-9, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 10-19, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brett) *Modified to correct event and text on 7/9/2020 (REK).
July 8, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re: #21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona, State of. (Roysden, Brunn)
July 8, 2020 Filing 34 *MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Arizona, State of. (Roysden, Brunn). *Added MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on 7/9/2020 (REK).
July 8, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jeffrey K Logan, Steven E Swaney, and Alex M Weingarten on behalf of Plaintiffs AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, and Yoga Six Franchise LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 7, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Errata re: #21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction REGARDING EXHIBIT 1 TO DECLARATION OF TREVOR LUCAS by Plaintiffs AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Howie, Brian)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The Court has received inquiries from media representatives who wish to listen to the July 13, 2020, telephonic hearing. Although the standard is that federal district courts may not broadcast their proceedings, the Executive Committee of the Judicial Conference recently issued a guidance document that "approve[s] a temporary exception to the policy to allow a judge to authorize the use of teleconference technology to provide the public and the media audio access to court proceedings while public access to federal courthouses generally, or with respect to a particular district, is restricted due to health and safety concerns during the Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) pandemic." Given this development, public access to the July 13, 2020 telephonic hearing will be permitted. Members of the media seeking access are directed to email AZD-PIO@azd.uscourts.gov to obtain dialing instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 43.1, participants are reminded that audiotaping court proceedings is prohibited. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/6/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
July 6, 2020 Filing 31 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC: Certificate of Service re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Request for Judicial Notice upon Governor Douglas Ducey on July 6, 2020. (Howie, Brian)
July 6, 2020 Filing 30 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC: Certificate of Service re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Request for Judicial Notice upon The State of Arizona on July 6, 2020. (Howie, Brian)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that Defendants shall file a Response to the #21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by 5:00 p.m. on July 8, 2020 and Plaintiffs shall file a Reply by 9:30 a.m. on July 10, 2020. ORDERED setting a Telephonic Temporary Restraining Order Hearing for 7/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Counsel will receive dial-in instructions by separate electronic mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if any member of the public wishes to listen to the telephonic hearing, they shall contact chambers, Humetewa_Chambers@azd.uscourts.gov via electronic mail. If any member of the media wishes to listen to the telephonic hearing, they shall contact AZD-PIO@azd.uscourts.gov via electronic mail. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/6/2020. (LFIG)
July 6, 2020 Filing 28 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure (8), Consent/Election Form (8) upon Governor Douglas Ducey on July 2, 2020. (Howie, Brian)
July 6, 2020 Filing 27 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure (8), Consent/Election Form (8) upon The State of Arizona on July 2, 2020. (Howie, Brian)
July 6, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett William Johnson on behalf of Douglas A Ducey. (Johnson, Brett)
July 6, 2020 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-1310-PHX-DJH. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 3, 2020 Filing 22 *REQUEST for Judicial Notice re: #21 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Exhibit 7-11, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Howie, Brian) *Modified to add document link on 7/6/2020 (REK).
July 3, 2020 Filing 21 *MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (with Notice) by AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Part 1, #3 Exhibit A - Part 2, #4 Exhibit A - Part 3, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Howie, Brian). *Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 7/6/2020 (REK).
July 2, 2020 Filing 23 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Arizona, State of, Douglas A Ducey. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18436608. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z. Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01310-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by AKT Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, PB Franchising LLC, Row House Franchise LLC, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Yoga Six Franchise LLC. (submitted by Brian Howie) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(REK)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yoga Six Franchise LLC identifying Corporate Parent Xponential Fitness LLC for Yoga Six Franchise LLC. (submitted by Brian Howie) (REK)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stretch Lab Franchise LLC identifying Corporate Parent Xponential Fitness LLC for Stretch Lab Franchise LLC. (submitted by Brian Howie) (REK)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Row House Franchise LLC identifying Corporate Parent Xponential Fitness LLC for Row House Franchise LLC. (submitted by Brian Howie) (REK)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PB Franchising LLC identifying Corporate Parent Xponential Fitness LLC for PB Franchising LLC. (submitted by Brian Howie) (REK)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CycleBar Franchising LLC identifying Corporate Parent Xponential Fitness LLC for CycleBar Franchising LLC. (submitted by Brian Howie) (REK)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Club Pilates Franchise LLC identifying Corporate Parent Xponential Fitness LLC for Club Pilates Franchise LLC. (submitted by Brian Howie) (REK)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AKT Franchise LLC identifying Corporate Parent Xponential Fitness LLC for AKT Franchise LLC. (submitted by Brian Howie) (REK)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Xponential Fitness. (submitted by Brian Howie) (REK)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18436608 filed by PB Franchising LLC, AKT Franchise LLC, Xponential Fitness, Stretch Lab Franchise LLC, Club Pilates Franchise LLC, CycleBar Franchising LLC, Yoga Six Franchise LLC, Row House Franchise LLC. (submitted by Brian Howie) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xponential Fitness et al v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xponential Fitness
Represented By: Celeste M Brecht
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Steven E Swaney
Represented By: Brian Alexander Howie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AKT Franchise LLC
Represented By: Celeste M Brecht
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Steven E Swaney
Represented By: Brian Alexander Howie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stretch Lab Franchise LLC
Represented By: Celeste M Brecht
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Steven E Swaney
Represented By: Brian Alexander Howie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yoga Six Franchise LLC
Represented By: Celeste M Brecht
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Steven E Swaney
Represented By: Brian Alexander Howie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CycleBar Franchising LLC
Represented By: Celeste M Brecht
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Steven E Swaney
Represented By: Brian Alexander Howie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PB Franchising LLC
Represented By: Celeste M Brecht
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Steven E Swaney
Represented By: Brian Alexander Howie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Club Pilates Franchise LLC
Represented By: Celeste M Brecht
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Steven E Swaney
Represented By: Brian Alexander Howie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Row House Franchise LLC
Represented By: Celeste M Brecht
Represented By: Jeffrey K Logan
Represented By: Alex M Weingarten
Represented By: Steven E Swaney
Represented By: Brian Alexander Howie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Represented By: Gregory W Falls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas A Ducey
Represented By: Derek Conor Flint
Represented By: Colin Patrick Ahler
Represented By: Michael Calvanico
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Anni Lori Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara M Christ
Represented By: Craig Alan Morgan
Represented By: Gregory W Falls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Health Services
Represented By: Craig Alan Morgan
Represented By: Gregory W Falls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?