Brentwood Park Condominium Association Incorporated v. Warrington
Plaintiff: Brentwood Park Condominium Association Incorporated
Defendant: Wayne B Warrington, III
Consolidated Plaintiff: Kacie Kliebert
Case Number: 2:2020cv01390
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION re: #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Stipulation for Extension of Time for Counterclaimant to Respond to Counterdefendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (First Request) by Wayne B Warrington, III. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dessaules, Jonathan)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting the Motion to Consolidate Related Actions (Doc. #9 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall consolidate the following Case Nos. CV-20-01390-PHX-JJT and CV-20-01391-PHX-JJT with CV-20-01390-PHX-JJT as the lead case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-20-01390-PHX-JJT and shall be filed only in the lead case. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/10/2020. (Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-01390-JJT, 2:20-cv-01391-JJT) (LAD)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/14/2021. Dispositive motions due by 6/11/2021. (See attached Order for additional details and deadlines). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/10/2020. (JAMA)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Scheduling Conference held on 9/10/2020. Deadlines discussed and entered. Scheduling Order to follow. Discussion held re: Defendant's Motion to Consolidate Related Actions (Doc. #9 ). Formal order to follow. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Mark Holmgren, Ashley Moscarello and Lynn Allen for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Jonathan Dessaules and Ashley Hill for Defendants. (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 9:32 AM to 9:57 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Motion for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim by Wayne B Warrington, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibits A-G to Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibits H-X to Exhibit 2, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Dessaules, Jonathan)
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 *RESPONSE to Motion (Titled: Notice of No Objection to Motion to Consolidate) re: #9 Motion to Consolidate Cases by Brentwood Park Condominium Association Incorporated . (Allen, Lynn) *Modified to correct event, text, and add document link on 9/8/2020 (REK).
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #11 Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) filed by Brentwood Park Condominium Association Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Brentwood Park Condominium Association Incorporated. (Moscarello, Ashley)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Brentwood Park Condominium Association Incorporated. (Allen, Lynn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Wayne B Warrington, III. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-20-01390-PHX-JJT,CV-20-01391-JJT) (Dessaules, Jonathan)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brentwood Park Condominium Association Incorporated. (Allen, Lynn) *Modified to remove incorrect corporate party on 8/5/2020 (REK).
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 *ANSWER to #4 Complaint, Counterclaim by Brentwood Park Condominium Association Incorporated.(Allen, Lynn) *Modified to correct text and add document link on 8/5/2020 (REK).
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/22/2020. (JAMA)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/15/2020. (JAMA)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Brentwood Park Condominium Association Incorporated by Wayne B Warrington, III.(Dessaules, Jonathan)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Brentwood Park Condominium Association Incorporated.(BAC)
July 13, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Wayne B Warrington, III on 6/18/20(original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 6/24/20). (BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18468818. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01390-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-093610. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18468818 filed by Wayne B Warrington, III. (Dessaules, Jonathan) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Case Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brentwood Park Condominium Association Incorporated v. Warrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brentwood Park Condominium Association Incorporated
Represented By: Mark A Holmgren
Represented By: Ashley Nicole Moscarello
Represented By: Daniel Steven Francom
Represented By: Lynn M Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne B Warrington, III
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Represented By: Ashley Collins Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kacie Kliebert
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Represented By: Ashley Collins Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?