Fernando v. Dann et al
Plaintiff: Dilshan Fernando
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Jeffrey Dann, Adelante Healthcare Incorporated, Unknown Dann and United States
Case Number: 2:2020cv01488
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/25/2020. (RMV)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting the United States' #11 Motion for Relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice of Deficiency issued on July 27, 2020 (Doc. #4 ) and this Court's order of September 2, 2020 (Doc. #10 ) are hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/3/2020. (CLB)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION Relief from Filing Corporate Disclosure Statement and the Court's Sept. 2, 2020 Order re: #10 Order, Set/Reset Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline by United States. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Staes, William)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 VACATED by Doc. #12 - ORDER that Adelante Healthcare Incorporated file its Corporate Disclosure Statement within 10 business days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Adelante Healthcare Incorporated. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Form)(MMO) Modified on 9/3/2020 (CLB).
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Warning to ProSe Litigant by Adelante Healthcare Incorporated, Jeffrey Dann re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Staes, William)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Adelante Healthcare Incorporated, Jeffrey Dann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Staes, William)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 04:30 PM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 calendar days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/28/2020. (MMO)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/28/2020. (MMO)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE re: Substitution of United States for Defendants (U.S. for Jeffery Dann Adelante Healthcare) by Adelante Healthcare Incorporated, Jeffrey Dann . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Staes, William)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 VACATED by Doc. #12 -NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Adelante Healthcare Incorporated. (DLC) Modified on 9/3/2020 (CLB).
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (DLC)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-1488-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
July 27, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Exhibits 1 through 3; Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration; Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial upon Jeffrey Dann, MD on 12/6/2019. Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Exhibits 1 through 3; Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration; Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial upon Adelante Healthcare Incorporated on 11/27/2019. (Originals filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 12/9/2019) (DLC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa Superior Court, case number CV2019-009876 filed by Adelante Healthcare Incorporated, Jeffrey Dann. (Staes, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Verification, #6 Certification Regarding Scope of Employment Defendants Jeffery Dann, MD and Adelante Healthcare Incorproated)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernando v. Dann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Dann
Represented By: William Charles Staes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adelante Healthcare Incorporated
Represented By: William Charles Staes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: William Charles Staes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dilshan Fernando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?