Bodine v. Novad Management Consulting LLC et al
Plaintiff: Erma Bodine
Defendant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development and Novad Management Consulting LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01531
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Morrissey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, pursuant to the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (EJA)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation of Dismissal. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and terminate this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 8/18/20. (EJA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Solomon, William)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Solomon, William)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Morrissey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-1531-PHX-MTM. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (MCO)
August 3, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVE***SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service upon Secretary of Housing and Urban Development c/o US Attorney's Office on Bertica Cantor, Administrative Assistant on 7/2/2020. Upon Novad Management Consulting LLC c/o Corporation Service Company, Statutory Agent on 6/29/2020. (originals filed in Maricopa County Justice Court on 7/7/2020) (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Justice Court, case number CC2020-097746 filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Solomon, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodine v. Novad Management Consulting LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: William C Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novad Management Consulting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erma Bodine
Represented By: Bert Daniel Millett
Represented By: Ralph Anthony Caliendo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?