Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC v. Bank of America NA et al
Plaintiff: Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC
Defendant: Notre Dame Federal Credit Union, Desert Financial Credit Union, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA doing business as Chase Bank, U.S. Bank NA and Bank of America NA
Case Number: 2:2020cv01554
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Megan A Suehiro on behalf of Defendant U.S. Bank NA. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 6, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael S Kraut on behalf of Defendant U.S. Bank NA. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 2, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John Warren Rissier on behalf of Defendant U.S. Bank NA. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER pursuant to parties' #26 Stipulation of Dismissal IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Defendant Notre Dame Federal Credit Union is hereby dismissed from this action and the clerk is hereby directed to dismiss the present action as to Defendant Notre Dame Federal Credit Union with all parties to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 10/01/2020. (ESG)
September 30, 2020 Filing 28 REQUEST re: Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Defendants Bank of America NA, Desert Financial Credit Union, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, U.S. Bank NA. (Goodwin, Nicole)
September 30, 2020 Filing 27 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint for Declaratory Relief and Damages by Bank of America NA, Desert Financial Credit Union, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, U.S. Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G)(Goodwin, Nicole)
September 30, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Notre Dame Federal Credit Union by Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinovitch, Hart)
September 14, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael Steven Popok on behalf of Plaintiff Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 11, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorney Michael Popok removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF RECUSAL: ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by the Clerk of Court, by random lot, to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich, United States District Judge. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-20-1554-PHX-SMB. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set on October 27, 2020 before Judge Diane J. Humetewa, to be reset by Judge Susan M. Brnovich. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/2/2020. (LFIG)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part the #23 Stipulation as set forth in this Order. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until and including September 30, 2020. ORDERED denying the request to continue the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for October 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/28/2020. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
August 27, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines, Exceed Page Limitations, and Continue Scheduling Conference by Bank of America NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Gregory)
August 24, 2020 Filing 22 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference upon Bank of America, N.A., Desert Financial Credit Union, JPMorgan Chase Bank d/b/a Chase Bank, Notre Dame Federal Credit Union, and U.S. Bank, N.A. on 8/18/2020. (Gudmundson, Brian)
August 17, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorneys Mitchell G Mandell and Ben Meiselas removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 10/27/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/14/2020. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
August 14, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael E Adler on behalf of Plaintiff Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 14, 2020 Filing 20 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Order (Dkt. 11) upon U.S. Bank, N.A. on 8/11/2020. (Gudmundson, Brian)
August 14, 2020 Filing 19 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint Package upon U.S. Bank, N.A. on 8/10/2020. (Gudmundson, Brian)
August 14, 2020 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Order (Dkt. 11) upon JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. d/b/a Chase Bank on 8/11/2020. (Gudmundson, Brian)
August 14, 2020 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint Package upon JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. d/b/a Chase Bank on 8/10/2020. (Gudmundson, Brian)
August 14, 2020 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Order (Dkt. 11) upon Desert Financial Credit Union on 8/11/2020. (Gudmundson, Brian)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint Package upon Desert Financial Credit Union on 8/10/2020. (Gudmundson, Brian)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Order (Dkt. 11) upon Bank of America, N.A. on 8/11/2020. (Gudmundson, Brian)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint Package upon Bank of America, N.A. on 8/10/2020. (Gudmundson, Brian)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint Package and Order upon Notre Dame Federal Credit Union on 8/11/2020. (Gudmundson, Brian)
August 11, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Nitoj P Singh on behalf of Plaintiff Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 10, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael J Laird, Brian C Gudmundson on behalf of Plaintiff Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 10, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Harmeet K Dhillon on behalf of Plaintiff Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/7/2020. (LFIG)
August 7, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Mark John Geragos on behalf of Plaintiff Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-1554-PHX-DJH. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to U.S. Bank NA. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC. (Robinovitch, Hart)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bank of America NA, Desert Financial Credit Union, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Notre Dame Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Summons Desert Financial Credit Unit, #2 Summons JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, #3 Summons Notre Dame Federal Credit Union) (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18542365. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H. Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01554-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (REK)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC. (submitted by Hart Robinovitch) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (REK)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC. (submitted by Hart Robinovitch) (REK)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18542365 filed by Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC. (submitted by Hart Robinovitch) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC v. Bank of America NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Notre Dame Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Financial Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA doing business as Chase Bank
Represented By: Nicole Maroulakos Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank NA
Represented By: Michael S Kraut
Represented By: John Warren Rissier
Represented By: Megan A Suehiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Barbara J Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compu-Tax & Accounting LLC
Represented By: Michael E Adler
Represented By: Mitchell G Mandell
Represented By: Michael S Popok
Represented By: Benjamin Meiselas
Represented By: Brian C Gudmundson
Represented By: Michael J Laird
Represented By: Nitoj P Singh
Represented By: Hart Lawrence Robinovitch
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Represented By: Michael Steven Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?