Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL v. Salem
Plaintiff: Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL
Defendant: Mohamed Farouk Salem and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2020cv01622
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #45 MOTION to Set New Scheduling Order Deadlines re: #10 Scheduling Order filed by Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL, Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL. (Halaby, Andrew)
October 7, 2020 Filing 49 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan M. Brnovich: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/7/2020. Discussion held regarding the status of the case and the newly filed pending motions (Doc. #45 and #46 ). Given the newly filed pending motions, no further hearings will be set until those are resolved. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearances by Andrew Halaby and Shalayne Pillar for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearances by Matthew Bycer and Michael Marion for Defendants. (Court Reporter Christine Coaly) Hearing held 1:02 PM to 1:12 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
October 6, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re: #45 MOTION to Set New Scheduling Order Deadlines re: #10 Scheduling Order filed by Mohamed Farouk Salem. (Marion, Michael)
October 6, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Errata re: #45 MOTION to Set New Scheduling Order Deadlines re: #10 Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL, Counter Defendant Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL.. (Attachments: #1 Errata Corrected TOC and TOA)(Halaby, Andrew)
October 5, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION to Withdraw Deemed Admissions by Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL, Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Faith Consultation, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Halaby, Andrew)
October 5, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Set New Scheduling Order Deadlines re: #10 Scheduling Order by Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL, Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Sol Bou-Nacklie in Support of Motion to Set New Scheduling Order Deadlines, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Shazad Omar in Support of Motion to Set New Scheduling Order Deadlines, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Gourjia Odisho in Support of Motion to Set New Scheduling Order Deadlines, #4 Affidavit Certificate of Good Faith Consultation, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Halaby, Andrew)
October 5, 2020 Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER: the Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 8:45 AM is RESET IN TIME ONLY to 01:00 PM (15 mins allowed) before Judge Susan M. Brnovich. The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
September 3, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorneys Christopher Lisieski, Kurt Vote and Pahuoa Lor removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that the Consent #40 Motion to Reschedule Status Conference is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the September 4, 2020 Telephonic Status Conference is reset to 10/07/2020 at 08:45 a.m. (15 minutes allowed. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/02/2020. (ESG)
September 1, 2020 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL, Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL. (Pillar, Shalayne)
September 1, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Shalayne Lauren Pillar on behalf of Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL, Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL. (Pillar, Shalayne)
September 1, 2020 Filing 40 Consent MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Mohamed Farouk Salem. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marion, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Benjamin Marion on behalf of Mohamed Farouk Salem. (Marion, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Patrick W Kelly on behalf of Plaintiff Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL, Counter Defendant Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 20, 2020 Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER: setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 9/4/2020 at 08:45 AM (15 mins allowed) before Judge Susan M. Brnovich. The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL. (MAP)
August 18, 2020 Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading. (MAP)
August 18, 2020 Filing 35 Letter Re Transfer of 1:18-cv-00873-None (SKO) from the Eastern District of California to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-20-1622-PHX-SMB. (MAP)
August 18, 2020 Filing 34 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00873 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's #25 Motion to Vacate the Scheduling Order and Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, Modify Existing Scheduling Order; ORDER TRANSFERRING Case pursuant to 28:1404 to the District of Arizona, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/14/2020. (Martin-Gill, S) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The Court has deemed Plaintiff's "Motion to Vacate the Scheduling Order and Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, Modify Existing Scheduling Order," (Doc. #25 ), and Plaintiff's "Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(b)," (Doc. #29 ), both noticed for hearing on July 15, 2020 before the undersigned, suitable for decision WITHOUT oral argument. As such, the hearings on those motions are VACATED and the matters will be taken under submission as of that date. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/10/2020. (Kusamura, W) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY by Green Aire for Air Conditioning W.L.L., Green Aire for Air Conditioning W.L.L. re #25 Motion to Vacate,,,,. (Kelly, Patrick) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 30 OPPOSITION by Mohamed Farouk Salem to #25 Motion to Vacate,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Mohamed Farouk Salem's Declaration In Opposition To Plaintiff Green Aire For Air Conditioning, W.L.L.'S Motion to Vacate the Scheduling Order and Transfer Venue)(Lor, Pahoua) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for DISCOVERY (Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(b)) by Green Aire for Air Conditioning W.L.L., Green Aire for Air Conditioning W.L.L.. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick Kelly in Support of Motion to Withdraw Admissions, #2 Exhibit A in Supp of Kelly Decl, #3 Exhibit B in Supp of Kelly Decl, #4 Statement (Joint), #5 Exhibit 1 in Supp of Jt Stmt, #6 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Patrick) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT held on 6/16/2020. After discussion with the parties, a further Status Conference re Settlement is set for 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. To participate telephonically, each party is directed to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode1024453. The Court does not require the parties to file a status report prior to the hearing. Plaintiff's Counsel Andrew Halaby and Christopher Lisieski telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel Pahoua Lor telephonically present. (Rooney, M) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's "Motion to Vacate the Scheduling Order and Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, Modify Existing Scheduling Order" filed on June 10, 2020, (Doc. #25 ), and referred to the undersigned, (Doc. 26 ). Pursuant to the referral, the motion is hereby RE-SET for July 15, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/12/2020. (Kusamura, W) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The motion to vacate the scheduling order and transfer venue, or in the alternative modify the existing scheduling order #25 is referred to the assigned magistrate judge for appropriate action signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on June 12, 2020. (Munoz, I) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to VACATE the Scheduling Order and Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, Modify Existing Scheduling Order by Green Aire for Air Conditioning W.L.L., Green Aire for Air Conditioning W.L.L.. Attorney Halaby, Andrew Foster added. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before UnassignedDJ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sol Bou-Nacklie in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Decl of Bou-Nacklie, #3 Exhibit B to Decl of Bou-Nacklie, #4 Exhibit C to Decl of Bou-Nacklie, #5 Exhibit D to Decl of Bou-Nacklie, #6 Exhibit E to Decl of Bou-Nacklie, #7 Exhibit F to Decl of Bou-Nacklie, #8 Exhibit G to Decl of Bou-Nacklie, #9 Exhibit H to Decl of Bou-Nacklie, #10 Declaration of Shazad Omar in Support, #11 Exhibit I to Decl of Omar, #12 Exhibit J to Decl of Omar, #13 Exhibit K to Decl of Omar, #14 Exhibit L to Decl of Omar, #15 Exhibit M to Decl of Omar, #16 Exhibit N to Decl of Omar, #17 Exhibit O to Decl of Omar, #18 Declaration of Patrick Kelly in Support, #19 Exhibit P to Decl of Kelly, #20 Exhibit Q to Decl of Kelly, #21 Exhibit R to Decl of Kelly, #22 Exhibit S to Decl of Kelly, #23 Proposed Order)(Halaby, Andrew) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 24 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Kurt F. Vote,Christopher Adam Lisieski for Green Aire for Air Conditioning W.L.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vote, Kurt) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Andrew Foster Halaby on behalf of Green Aire for Air Conditioning W.L.L.. Attorney Halaby, Andrew Foster added. (Halaby, Andrew) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING #21 Substitution of Attorney, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/4/2020. Patrick W. Kelly for Green Aire for Air Conditioning W.L.L. in place of attorney Shazad Zahid Omar. (Rivera, O) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 21 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Green Aire for Air Conditioning W.L.L., Green Aire for Air Conditioning W.L.L.. (Kelly, Patrick) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The Court is in receipt of the "Stipulation... to Continue Settlement Conference and Trial" filed on 4/6/2020. (Doc. #19 .) The parties request to continue the settlement conference currently set for 4/16/2020 to 10/27/2020 or later, and continue the trial date currently set for 7/7/2020 accordingly. (Id. at 2.) The parties state that "Plaintiff, who resides in Saudi Arabia, is unable to participate in person" at the settlement conference because he is unable to travel due to the current coronavirus (COVID-19) public health emergency. (Id.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS IN PART the parties' request. Instead of continuing the settlement conference to a date certain, the Court VACATES the 4/16/2020 settlement conference and SETS a telephonic status hearing on 6/16/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean, to discuss the status of the case and set a new settlement conference date. The parties shall dial 1-888-251-2909, passcode 1024453, at the time of the status hearing.The Court further CONTINUES the pretrial conference currently set for 5/13/2020 to 11/12/2020 at 8:15 AM in Courtroom 4 before a United States District Judge, and CONTINUES the trial date currently set for 7/7/2020 to 1/5/2021 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before a United States District Judge. For more information regarding civil trials in this district during the current ongoing judicial emergency, the parties are referred to the "Standing Order in Light of Ongoing Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California," (Doc. #18 -1). Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/7/2020. (Kusamura, W) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continue Settlement Conference and Trial by Mohamed Farouk Salem. (Lor, Pahoua) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER UNASSIGNING DISTRICT JUDGE signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the inactive senior status of District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, this action is hereby unassigned until a new district judge is appointed. The parties are referred to the attached Standing Order in Light of Ongoing Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (Martin-Gill, S) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) To accommodate the Court's calendar, and with agreement by the parties, the Settlement Conference currently noticed for 1/23/2020 is continued and will now be held on 4/16/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The parties are reminded to refer to Judge Grosjean's settlement conference procedures, document #11 . Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/16/2020. (Rooney, M) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY MOTIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/6/2020. (Kusamura, W) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Mohamed Farouk Salem re #12 MOTION to COMPEL Plaintiff's Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set 1) , #14 MOTION to COMPEL Plaintiff's Responses to Request for Admission (Set One) , #13 MOTION to COMPEL Plaintiff's Responses to Request for Production of Documents (Set One) . (Lor, Pahoua) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to COMPEL Plaintiff's Responses to Request for Admission (Set One) by Mohamed Farouk Salem. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Pahoua C Lor in Support of Defendant Mohamed Farouk Sselem's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Admission (Set One), #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Mohamed Farouk Selem's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Admission (Set One))(Lor, Pahoua) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to COMPEL Plaintiff's Responses to Request for Production of Documents (Set One) by Mohamed Farouk Salem. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Pahoua C Lor in Support of Defendant Mohamed Farouk Selem's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Request for Production of Documents (Set One), #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Mohamed Farouk Selem's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Request for Production of Documents (Set One))(Lor, Pahoua) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to COMPEL Plaintiff's Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set 1) by Mohamed Farouk Salem. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Pahoua C. Lor in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories (Set 1), #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lor, Pahoua) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/7/2018. (Rooney, M) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER : Initial Disclosures: October 30, 2018; Non-Expert Discovery: November 29, 2019; Expert Disclosures: December 6, 2019; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: December 16, 2019; Expert Discovery: January 10; 2020; Settlement Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2020 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/23/2018. (Kusamura, W) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Waiver of Disqualification of Settlement Judge Pursuant to Local Rule 270(b) by Mohamed Farouk Salem. (Lor, Pahoua) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: On October 18, 2018, the parties appeared telephonically for a scheduling conference. Shazad Omar, Esq., appeared telephonically on behalf of Plaintiff/Counter-defendant. Mike Chappars, Esq., appeared telephonically on behalf of Defendant/Counterclaimant. As discussed with the parties, by no later than 10:00 AM on October 22, 2018, each party shall file a notice of waiver regarding the disqualification of the undersigned to conduct the settlement conference in this matter (found online here http://www.caed.uscourts.gov/caednew/index.cfm/forms/civil/), if they so choose. See Local Rule 270(b). (Rosales, O) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Green Aire for Air Conditioning W.L.L.. (Omar, Shazad) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) : Pursuant to the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference (Doc. #3 ), the parties were to file their joint scheduling report one full week prior to their scheduling conference set for October 18, 2018. No joint scheduling report has been filed. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 9:00 AM on October 16, 2018. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on any and all counsel as well as any party or parties who cause non-compliance with this order. See Local Rule 110. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/12/2018. (Rosales, O) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER by Green Aire for Air Conditioning W.L.L..(Omar, Shazad) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Mohamed Farouk Salem by Mohamed Farouk Salem. Attorney Lor, Pahoua C added. by Mohamed Farouk Salem. Attorney Lor, Pahoua C added. (Attachments: #1 Counterclaim)(Lor, Pahoua) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 TRADEMARK NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Trademark #1:* see complaint * * see complaint * * see complaint * ; copy of Complaint and Trademark Report emailed to U.S. Office of Patents and Trademarks. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 Trademark Report, #4 VDRP) (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Mohamed Farouk Salem* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Shazad Zahid Omar* *Apex Lawyers, Inc.* *21671 Gateway Center Drive, Suite 108* *Diamond Bar, CA 91765*. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against Mohamed Farouk Salem by Green Aire for Air Conditioning W.L.L.. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7732606) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Omar, Shazad) [Transferred from caed on 8/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL v. Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed Farouk Salem
Represented By: Pahoua C Lor
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Marion
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Bycer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Aire for Air Conditioning WLL
Represented By: Andrew Foster Halaby
Represented By: Christopher Adam Lisieski
Represented By: Patrick W Kelly
Represented By: Shazad Zahid Omar
Represented By: Kurt F Vote
Represented By: Shalayne Lauren Pillar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?