Melton v. Waffle House Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Nina Melton
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Waffle House Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv01624
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Waffle House Incorporated. (Levy, Ellen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Nina Melton. (Victor, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for November 5, 2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 304, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2118. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 9/4/20. (SST)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Waffle House Incorporated. (Levy, Ellen)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant Waffle House Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Waffle House Incorporated.(Levy, Ellen)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18581403. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01624-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (BAC)
August 18, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon James Dyer (a.k.a. James Oyer), statutory agent for JD's Wild West Waffles Incorporated dba Waffle House Incorporated on 6/22/20 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 6/22/20).(BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Waffle House Incorporated. (Levy, Ellen) (BAC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-053497. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18581403 filed by Waffle House Incorporated. (Levy, Ellen) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Ellen S Levy)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melton v. Waffle House Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Melton
Represented By: Jeffrey Lloyd Victor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waffle House Incorporated
Represented By: Ellen Sue Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?