KE ARMS LLC v. GWACS Armory LLC et al
Plaintiff: KE ARMS LLC
Defendant: Jud Gudgel, Unknown Parties, GWACS Defense Incorporated, Russell L Anderson and GWACS Armory LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01625
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, in the Alternative, to Transfer MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case filed by Russell L Anderson, GWACS Armory LLC, GWACS Defense Incorporated, Jud Gudgel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jud Gudgel)(Proksel, Colin)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, in the Alternative, to Transfer MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case filed by KE ARMS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Russell Phagan, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - SST Asset Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - GWACS Asset Purchase Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - NDA, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - KE Arms Opposition to Motion to Transfer, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Letter, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - AZ Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - OK Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Motion to Transfer or Stay, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue)(Calaway, Alexander)
September 8, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Alexander K Calaway on behalf of Plaintiff KE ARMS LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 2, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brian R Hardy on behalf of Plaintiff KE ARMS LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 1, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for James E Weger on behalf of Defendants Russell L Anderson, GWACS Armory LLC, GWACS Defense Incorporated, Jud Gudgel, Unknown Parties. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Plaintiff's Filing in Related Oklahoma Case by Russell L Anderson, GWACS Armory LLC, GWACS Defense Incorporated, Jud Gudgel re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, in the Alternative, to Transfer MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Proksel, Colin)
August 28, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Tadd JP Bogan on behalf of Defendants Russell L Anderson, GWACS Armory LLC, GWACS Defense Incorporated, Jud Gudgel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 *MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction,and, in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer by Russell L Anderson, GWACS Armory LLC, GWACS Defense Incorporated, Jud Gudgel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jud Gudgel, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Russell L. Anderson, #3 Exhibit Notice of Certification of Conferral)(Proksel, Colin). *Added MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case on 8/26/2020 (WLP).
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GWACS Defense Incorporated. (Proksel, Colin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GWACS Armory LLC. (Proksel, Colin)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/19/2020. (JAMA)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to KE ARMS LLC. (MYE)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to GWACS Armory LLC, GWACS Defense Incorporated. (MYE)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18580683. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01625-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
August 18, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon GWACS Defense (R.A.) Corporation Service Co. on 7/20/20; GWACS Armory LLC on 7/22/20; Russell Anderson and Jon Gudgel on 7/23/20. (Originals were filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 8/12/20.) (MYE) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by GWACS Armory LLC, GWACS Defense Incorporated, Jud Gudgel, Russell L Anderson. (Proksel, Colin) (MYE)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-005131. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18580683 filed by GWACS Armory LLC, GWACS Defense Incorporated, Jud Gudgel, Russell L Anderson. (Proksel, Colin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Colin Proksel, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Jud Gudgel, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Russell Anderson)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KE ARMS LLC v. GWACS Armory LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jud Gudgel
Represented By: Colin Matthew Proksel
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: James E Weger
Represented By: Tadd JP Bogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GWACS Defense Incorporated
Represented By: Colin Matthew Proksel
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: James E Weger
Represented By: Tadd JP Bogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell L Anderson
Represented By: Colin Matthew Proksel
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: James E Weger
Represented By: Tadd JP Bogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GWACS Armory LLC
Represented By: Colin Matthew Proksel
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: James E Weger
Represented By: Tadd JP Bogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KE ARMS LLC
Represented By: Kiri Tamar Semerdjian
Represented By: Alexandra Mijares Nash
Represented By: Gregory W Seibt
Represented By: Brian R Hardy
Represented By: Alexander K Calaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?