Kehoe v. Stewart et al
Plaintiff: John Kehoe
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Robert Stewart, Timothy East, City of Phoenix Police Department and Kenneth Salem
Case Number: 2:2020cv01626
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Referring Judge: Susan M Brnovich
2 Judge: James F Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Notice (Other) filed by John Kehoe, #10 Notice (Other) filed by John Kehoe, #11 Notice (Other) filed by John Kehoe. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Request for Waiver of Service by John Kehoe Kenneth Salem. (Bradley, Percival)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Request for Waiver of Service by John Kehoe to Timothy East. (Bradley, Percival)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Request for Waiver of Service by John Kehoe to Robert Stewart. (Bradley, Percival)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Amended Complaint filed by John Kehoe. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading. Also, the document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use event Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) and attach a copy of the amended pleading that indicates in what respect it differs from the pleading which it amends, by bracketing or striking through the text that was deleted and underlining the text that was added. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John Kehoe.(Bradley, Percival)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by City of Phoenix Police Department. (Graffious, Derek)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - No later than 90 days from the filing date of this Order, Plaintiff must either serve each unserved Defendant or seek a waiver of service for each unserved Defendant. If Plaintiffs do not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Amended Complaint on any unserved Defendant within 90 days from the filing date of this Order, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. This matter is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. The parties' stipulation to extend the time for Defendant City of Phoenix Police Department to respond to the Amended Complaint (Doc. #4 ) is granted and such response must be filed no later than September 11, 2020. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 8/26/20. (EJA)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by City of Phoenix Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graffious, Derek)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Errata re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant City of Phoenix Police Department.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Graffious, Derek)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MCO)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-005184. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18582589 filed by City of Phoenix Police Department. (Masterson, John) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kehoe v. Stewart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Phoenix Police Department
Represented By: Derek Ryan Graffious
Represented By: John T Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kehoe
Represented By: Percival R Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?