Young v. Brnovich et al
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Jerry Weiers and Mark Brnovich
Case Number: 2:2020cv01686
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed October 23, 2020, judgment of dismissal is entered. Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice. (SLQ)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider (Doc. #8 ). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED in light of the dismissal of this case, directing the Clerk of Court to term the pending Motions (Docs. #3 , #13 and #17 ) as moot. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/23/20. (SLQ)
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Schepler on behalf of Jerry Weiers. (Schepler, Aaron)
October 13, 2020 Filing 18 *NOT FILED per #20 * LODGED Proposed First Amended Complaint re: #17 MOTION to Remove Mark Brnovich as Defendant MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION to Compel the Court to Grant Plaintiff's Motion to File Documents Electronically. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (EJA) Modified on 10/23/2020 (SLQ).
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Remove Mark Brnovich as Defendant, MOTION to File an Amended Complaint, MOTION to Compel the Court to Grant #3 Plaintiff's Motion to File Documents Electronically by Huguette Nicole Young. (EJA)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/29/20 to Jerry Weiers. (EJA)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on Mark Brnovich to 9/1/20. (EJA)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #8 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #7 Order, Set Deadlines, Terminate Motions MOTION to Compel the Court to Honor Rule 5.1(b) MOTION to a Speedy Hearing Under Rule 57, #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mark Brnovich. (Napolitano, Anthony)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through E to Brnovich Motion to Dismiss)(Napolitano, Anthony)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Roman Napolitano on behalf of Mark Brnovich. (Napolitano, Anthony)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on November 30, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/1/20. (EJA)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 9/1/20 to Mark Brnovich, Arizona Attorney Genearl. (EJA)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Huguette Nicole Young. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (EJA)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Reconsider Plaintiff's Application Proceed IFP Given new Circumstances re: #7 Order, MOTION to Compel the Court to Honor Rule 5.1(b), MOTION to a Speedy Hearing Under Rule 57 by Huguette Nicole Young. (13 pages) (EJA)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ). ORDERED that within 30 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff must either pay the $400.00 filing fee or file a file a non-prisoner Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Cost. FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/9/20. (EJA)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (EJA)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01686-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (EJA)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Huguette Nicole Young. (EJA)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Huguette Nicole Young. (EJA)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Huguette Nicole Young. (EJA)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 envelope)(EJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Brnovich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Weiers
Represented By: Aaron Schepler
Represented By: Michael David Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Represented By: Anthony Roman Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?