Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated v. Khachatrian et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated
Defendant: Araik Khachatrian individually and as sole member and manager of: other Arik Company LLC doing business as 27th Ave. Bar & Grill and Arik Company LLC doing business as 27th Ave. Bar & Grill
Case Number: 2:2020cv01729
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Morrissey
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Araik Khachatrian and Arik Company LLC on 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Janis, Ryan)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Arik Company LLC, Araik Khachatrian. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 8, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ryan R Janis on behalf of Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Janis, Ryan)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated. (Janis, Ryan)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated. (Janis, Ryan)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (REK)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated. (REK)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18632985. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T. Morrissey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01729-PHX-MTM. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (REK)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18632985 filed by Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated. (submitted by Ryan Janis) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated v. Khachatrian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Araik Khachatrian individually and as sole member and manager of: other Arik Company LLC doing business as 27th Ave. Bar & Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arik Company LLC doing business as 27th Ave. Bar & Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated
Represented By: Ryan R Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?