Packerland Brokerage Services Incorporated v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Packerland Brokerage Services Incorporated
Defendant: John Beaty, John Walker and Carol Walker
Case Number: 2:2020cv01745
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Submit Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Packerland Brokerage Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palfai, Jamie)
October 30, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Beaty, Carol Walker, John Walker. (Mitchell, Robert)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR FINAL PRETRIAL: The parties shall jointly prepare a Proposed Final Pretrial Order and shall lodge it with the Court no later than 4:00 p.m. on January 28, 2021. See document for further details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 10/27/2020. (REK)
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan M. Brnovich: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/23/2020. Discussion held regarding trial and discovery. The parties agree to a one (1) day bench trial and that a discovery schedule is not needed at this time. It is ordered setting a 1-day bench trial for 2/04/2021 at 9:00 AM. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Jamie Palfai for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Robert Mitchell for Defendants. Bench Trial set for 2/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. (Court Reporter Christine Coaly.) Hearing held 8:44 AM to 9:53 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 *ORDER granting #14 Stipulation for extension of time and extending the time for Defendants to file a response to Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction to 10/30/2020. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 10/14/2020. (ESG) Docket text modified on to update response from 10/3 to 10/30 as stated in the pdf.
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #13 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by John Beaty, Carol Walker, John Walker, #14 Stipulation filed by John Beaty, Carol Walker, John Walker. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
October 12, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION re: #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by John Beaty, Carol Walker, John Walker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Mitchell, Robert)
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D Mitchell on behalf of John Beaty, Carol Walker, John Walker. (Mitchell, Robert)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 10/23/2020 at 08:45 AM (15 minutes allowed) before Judge Susan M. Brnovich. The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Packerland Brokerage Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palfai, Jamie)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE re: NOTICE OF SERVICE RE ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS & STRIKE PER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b) & 12(f) by Packerland Brokerage Services Incorporated re: #6 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Palfai, Jamie)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Packerland Brokerage Services Incorporated. (Palfai, Jamie)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Packerland Brokerage Services Incorporated: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 09/08/2020 to John Walker, Carol Walker and John Beaty . (Palfai, Jamie)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 12/07/2020. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/09/2020. (ESG)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/09/2020. (ESG)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/09/2020. (ESG)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Packerland Brokerage Services Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Packerland Brokerage Services Incorporated. (ARC)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18638872. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-1745-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18638872 filed by Packerland Brokerage Services Incorporated. (Palfai, Jamie) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Packerland Brokerage Services Incorporated v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Beaty
Represented By: Robert D Mitchell
Represented By: Sarah Keturah Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Walker
Represented By: Robert D Mitchell
Represented By: Sarah Keturah Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Walker
Represented By: Robert D Mitchell
Represented By: Sarah Keturah Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Packerland Brokerage Services Incorporated
Represented By: Jamie Bela Palfai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?