Lawrence v. Sony Pictures Entertainment Incorporated
Plaintiff: Pamella Lawrence
Defendant: Sony Pictures Entertainment Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv01785
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to #6 Order, Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint #1 , with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint no later than October 15, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not file an Amended Complaint by October 15, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action without further Order of this Court. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/30/2020. (REK)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01785-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE (Order/Referral to ADR) by Pamella Lawrence. (REK)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Pamella Lawrence. (REK)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Pamella Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. Sony Pictures Entertainment Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamella Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Entertainment Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?