Filtermag Incorporated v. Filtermag International Incorporated
Plaintiff: Filtermag Incorporated
Defendant: Filtermag International Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv01827
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #19 ). The request was made on the date Defendant's answer was due and states that additional time is needed to explore settlement. Because it is stipulated to, the Court will grant one last extension of this deadline. Defendant shall have until November 20, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no further extensions of this deadline will be granted. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/9/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
November 6, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (Second Request) by Filtermag International Incorporated. (Vasta, Mario)
October 19, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #16 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Filtermag International Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Please note for future filings. Additionally, Filtermag International Incorporated has been removed as a corporate party based on document #16 . No further action is required. It is not necessary to refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting the #14 Stipulation For Extension and allowing an extension until November 6, 2020 for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/19/2020. (LFIG)
October 19, 2020 Filing 16 * Corporate Disclosure Statement by Filtermag International Incorporated. (Vasta, Mario) * Document not in compliance with Local Rule; Filtermag International Incorporated removed as corporate parent; attorney noticed on 10/20/2020 (LAD).
October 19, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Filtermag International Incorporated.(LFIG)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Filtermag International Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Vasta, Mario)
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mario Carmelo Vasta on behalf of Filtermag International Incorporated. (Vasta, Mario)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE re: of Service by Filtermag Incorporated re: #11 Order, Set/Reset Hearings of Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. (Ashman, Kenneth)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference is set for 12/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. See attachment for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/2/2020. (CLB)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Filtermag Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action upon Filtermag International, Inc. on 09/25/2020. (Ashman, Kenneth) * Modified to correct service date from 9/24/20 to 9/25/20 on 10/2/2020 (LAD).
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Filtermag Incorporated. (Ashman, Kenneth)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/18/2020. (CLB)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Filtermag International Incorporated. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Filtermag Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1): The following information must be stated upon the first page of every document - The name, address, email address, State Bar Attorney number, telephone number, and optionally the fax number, of the attorney appearing for the party in the action or proceeding and whether the attorney appears for the plaintiff, defendant, or other party - in propria persona - must be typewritten or printed in the space to the left of the center of the page and beginning at line one (1) on the first page. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (REK)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18679504. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01827-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Filtermag Incorporated. (submitted by Kenneth Ashman) (REK)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Filtermag Incorporated. (submitted by Kenneth Ashman) (REK)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18679504 filed by Filtermag Incorporated. (submitted by Kenneth Ashman) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Filtermag Incorporated v. Filtermag International Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Filtermag International Incorporated
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Represented By: Stephen Thomas Sullivan
Represented By: Mario Carmelo Vasta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filtermag Incorporated
Represented By: Kenneth Jay Ashman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?