Jackson v. Mesa Community College et al
Plaintiff: Darlene Jackson
Defendant: Shanel Carter, Sonya Pearson, Mesa Community College and Cynthia K Jepsen
Case Number: 2:2020cv01869
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation (Doc. #18 ) is granted. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the Second Amended Complaint is extended to December 4, 2020. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/13/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Shanel Carter, Cynthia K Jepsen, Mesa Community College. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaona, David)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shanel Carter, Cynthia K Jepsen, Mesa Community College, Sonya Pearson filed by Darlene Jackson.(DXD)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Darlene Jackson. (DXD)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Darlene Jackson: Proof of Service re: Summons/ Complaint upon Cynthia K Jepsen on 10/15/20. (DXD)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Darlene Jackson: Proof of Service re: Summons/ Complaint upon Shanel Carter on 10/15/20. (DXD)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Darlene Jackson: Proof of Service re: Summons/ Complaint upon Mesa Community College on 10/15/20. (DXD)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the filings at Docs. #12 and #13 are struck. Plaintiff shall not attempt to file any more amended complaints without (1) certifying that Defendants consent to the amendment or (2) filing a motion for leave to amend. Plaintiff shall not file a motion for leave to amend without first seeking Defendants' consent to the amendment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the Court's November 2, 2020 order, the FAC (Doc. #9 ) remains the operative complaint in this action. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/5/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David F Gaona on behalf of Shanel Carter, Cynthia K Jepsen, Mesa Community College. (Gaona, David)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 *STRICKEN by Doc. 14 * AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shanel Carter, Cynthia K Jepsen, Mesa Community College, Sonya Pearson filed by Darlene Jackson.(DXD) Modified on 11/5/2020 (MAW).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 *STRICKEN by Doc. 14 * NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Darlene Jackson. (DXD) Modified on 11/5/2020 (MAW).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The Clerk shall (1) strike the filing at Doc. #8 , including its attachments, and (2) file the first four pages only of Doc. #8 on the docket as the "First Amended Complaint" (filed at Doc. #9 ). The date on which the four-page amended complaint is filed by the Clerk will be the operative filing date, upon which Defendants response deadline will be based. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/2/20. (DXD)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 *ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the FAC (Doc. #5 ) and accompanying document (Doc. #6 ) are struck. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to David F. Gaona at the address listed on the FAC. If Mr. Gaona is representing Plaintiff in this action, he is directed to file a notice of appearance within seven days of this order [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/28/20. (MAW) *Modified signature date and document type on 10/29/2020 (SCH).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shanel Carter, Cynthia K Jepsen, Mesa Community College, Sonya Pearson filed by Darlene Jackson.(DXD)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 **Stricken per Order #10 ** Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shanel Carter, Cynthia K Jepsen, Mesa Community College, Sonya Pearson filed by Darlene Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(DXD) Modified on 11/2/2020 (DXD).
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 *STRICKEN by Doc. #7 * NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) (Redline document) by Darlene Jackson. (5 pages) (WLP) Modified on 10/29/2020 (MAW).
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *STRICKEN by Doc. #7 * FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Darlene Jackson. (3 pages) (WLP) Modified on 10/29/2020 (MAW).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Shanel Carter, Cynthia K Jepsen, Mesa Community College, Sonya Pearson and mailed to plaintiff. (BAS) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on December 28, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 9/28/20. (MAW)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (DXD)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX222669. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01869-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number PHX222669 filed by Darlene Jackson.(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Mesa Community College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanel Carter
Represented By: David F Gaona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Community College
Represented By: David F Gaona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia K Jepsen
Represented By: David F Gaona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?