Sottile v. Sottile et al
Plaintiff: Mark Sottile
Defendant: BRP US Incorporated, Joseph Sottile and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2020cv01992
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Bradley P Knypstra on behalf of Plaintiff Mark Sottile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re: #17 : IT IS ORDERED granting the request for telephonic appearance. Any counsel or party may appear telephonically for the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by calling into the Court at the time set for the hearing (Instructions to be provided by email); anyone may also appear in person if they so choose. Ordered by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 12/8/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
December 8, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST re: Request to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Mark Sottile. (Simoneaux-Cuaso, Maggie)
December 4, 2020 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by BRP US Incorporated. (Gruse, Karl)
November 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Errata by Defendant Joseph Sottile.. (DeCiancio, Joel)
November 25, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Joseph Sottile. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Notice of Forum and Answer)(DeCiancio, Joel)
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Joseph Sottile. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(DeCiancio, Joel)
November 19, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: To accommodate the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference presently set for Wednesday, 12/16/2020, is RESET IN TIME ONLY from 1:30 PM to 12/16/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge James A. Teilborg. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 12/16/2020 at 01:30 PM, in Courtroom 503. Counsel shall jointly file their Proposed Case Management Plan with the Clerk of the Court not less than ten (10) days before the Scheduling Conference. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 11/13/2020. (RMW)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that, based on the proof of service for Joseph Sottile (Doc. #9 ), Plaintiff shall file an application for entry of default against Joseph Sottile by 11/30/2020 or Defendant Joseph Sottile will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 11/13/2020. (RMW)
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Plaintiff Re Service by Plaintiff Mark Sottile. (Simoneaux-Cuaso, Maggie)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: On 10/22/2020, this Court ordered Plaintiff to file a status report by 10/29/2020 regarding service on Defendant Joseph Sottile. Plaintiff failed to do so. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff must file the required status report by 11/2/2020, or Joseph Sottile will be dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 10/30/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
October 27, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Maggie R Simoneaux-Cuaso on behalf of Plaintiff Mark Sottile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (text only): IT IS ORDERED that by 10/29/2020, Plaintiff shall file a status report regarding service of process on Defendant Joseph Sottile. Ordered by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 10/22/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by BRP US Incorporated.(Gruse, Karl)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Plaintiff must file a notice within 7 days of any Defendant answering that the parties are ready for a Rule 16 scheduling conference. See Order for further details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/15/20. (DXD)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRP US Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc., Corporate Parent BRP, Inc. for BRP US Incorporated. (Gruse, Karl)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to BRP US Incorporated. (REK)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18774546. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A. Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01992-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-010901. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18774546 filed by BRP US Incorporated. (submitted by Karl Gruse) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK)
October 14, 2020 ***State Court Record received on 10/14/2020***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mark Sottile: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon BRP US Incorporated via CT Corporation System, Phoenix, AZ on 10/12/2020.***Service of Process Transmittal filed in State Court on unknown date, docketed in U.S. District Court on 10/14/2020 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sottile v. Sottile et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRP US Incorporated
Represented By: Karl John Gruse
Represented By: William W Drury, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Sottile
Represented By: Joel Dominic DeCiancio
Represented By: Christopher Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Sottile
Represented By: Maggie Simoneaux-Cuaso
Represented By: Maggie R Simoneaux-Cuaso
Represented By: Bradley P Knypstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?