Williams v. Pfizer Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kenyhan Williams
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pharmacia LLC, Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer Incorporated, Pharmacia Corporation and Warner-Lambert Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02077
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer Incorporated, Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Hendricks, John)
December 9, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Kenyhan Williams. (Sheehan, Connor)
December 4, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorneys Jeffrey H Horowitz and Sharon D Mayo terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting the Stipulation (Doc. #11 ). The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #9 ) is extended to 12/9/2020. The deadline for Defendants to reply is extended to 12/23/2020. There will be no further extensions absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 11/24/2020. (RMW)
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kenyhan Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mosier, Robert)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer Incorporated, Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC identifying Other Affiliate Wyeth Holdings LLC for Pharmacia LLC; Corporate Parent Pfizer, Inc. for Warner-Lambert Company LLC; Corporate Parent Pfizer International LLC for Parke, Davis & Company LLC; Other Affiliate Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Pfizer Incorporated. (Hendricks, John)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 * MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer Incorporated, Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Hendricks, John) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 11/19/2020 (LAD).
November 5, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Connor G Sheehan on behalf of Plaintiff Kenyhan Williams. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST re: Request for Certificate of Good Standing by Plaintiff Kenyhan Williams. (Sheehan, Connor)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Kenyhan Williams. Amendment to #1 Complaint Automated Civil Case Cover Sheet. (Mosier, Robert)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Kenyhan Williams. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Pfizer Incorporated, Pharmacia LLC, Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18816952. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-2077-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case by Kenyhan Williams. (Mosier, Robert) (MYE)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Kenyhan Williams. (Mosier, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MYE)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18816952 filed by Kenyhan Williams. (Mosier, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Pfizer Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company LLC
Represented By: Sharon D Mayo
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Jeffrey H Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia LLC
Represented By: Sharon D Mayo
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Jeffrey H Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parke, Davis & Company LLC
Represented By: Sharon D Mayo
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Jeffrey H Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Incorporated
Represented By: Sharon D Mayo
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Jeffrey H Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Sharon D Mayo
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Jeffrey H Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company
Represented By: Sharon D Mayo
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Jeffrey H Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyhan Williams
Represented By: Robert A Mosier
Represented By: Connor G Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?