Zachi v. Security Industry Specialists Incorporated
Plaintiff: Mohammed Zachi
Defendant: Security Industry Specialists Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv02463
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Plaintiff's unopposed motion to stay pending arbitration (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to close this case, whereupon, by proper motion of the prevailing party at arbitration, it may be reopened or dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/26/2021. (RMV)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay by Mohammed Zachi. (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Agreement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mazaheri, Bernard)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR CERTAIN EMPLOYMENT CASES. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/23/2020. (RMV)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/23/2020. (RMV)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19002263. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-02463-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Mohammed Zachi.(Mazaheri, Bernard) (REM)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19002263 filed by Mohammed Zachi.(Mazaheri, Bernard) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zachi v. Security Industry Specialists Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Zachi
Represented By: Bernard R Mazaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Industry Specialists Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?