Turner v. Greondyke Transportation
Plaintiff: Keith Turner
Defendant: Greondyke Transportation
Case Number: 2:2020cv02476
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Order (Doc. #5 ), this action is hereby dismissed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ORDERED that Plaintiff's #1 Complaint is dismissed with leave to file a First Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date this Order is entered. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action without further order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff elects to file a First Amended Complaint, it may not be served until and unless the Court issues an Order screening the amended complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/30/2020. (LFIG)
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MHW)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 20-2476-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MHW)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Keith Turner. (6 pages) (MHW)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Keith Turner. (7 pages)(MHW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Greondyke Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greondyke Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?