Wisecarver v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Delrita Wisecarver
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv02486
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Referring Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED referring this case to Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle to prepare a Report and Recommendation ("R&R") in this matter. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 02/12/2021. (MHW)
February 11, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Dominic W Lanza. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-2486-PHX-DWL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 10, 2021 Filing 13 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
February 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sathya Oum appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Oum, Sathya)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 *SCHEDULING ORDER - This action was commenced on December 29, 2020. The Clerk of Court assigned this case to the expedited track pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 16.2(b)(1)(A)(i). Pursuant to LRCiv 16.2(b)(1)(B), the Court issues this Scheduling Order without holding a scheduling conference. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 1/27/2021. (WLP) Modified on 2/11/2021 (MAW).
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, Attorney General and US Attorney's Office - District of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(WLP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in forma pauperis (doc. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff is responsible for service of the Summons and Complaint on Defendant pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 1/27/2021. (WLP)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-2486-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Delrita Wisecarver. (Dicus, Kathryn) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Delrita Wisecarver. (Dicus, Kathryn) (MCO)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Delrita Wisecarver. (Dicus, Kathryn) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisecarver v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Sathya Oum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delrita Wisecarver
Represented By: Kathryn Dicus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?