Govan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Shannon Selisha Govan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00045
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shannon Selisha Govan: Notice of Service re: Summons upon William Barr, US Attorney General (1/25/2021); Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (1/25/2021); Michael Bailey, US Attorney for the District of Arizona (1/25/2021) on 1/25/2021; 1/25/2021; 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Larkin, Robin)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Oscar Gonzalez appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Gonzalez de Llano, Oscar)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BAS)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ), without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 1/12/2021. (RMW)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T. Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00045-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Shannon Selisha Govan.(Fern, Sarah) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(REM)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Shannon Selisha Govan.(Fern, Sarah) (REM)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Shannon Selisha Govan.(Fern, Sarah) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Govan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Selisha Govan
Represented By: Robin Michelle Larkin
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Oscar Gonzalez de Llano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?