Grant et al v. Ivchenko et al
Plaintiff: Travis Grant, Mariel Grant and Kyle Grant
Defendant: Andrew Ivchenko and Renee Ivchenko
Case Number: 2:2021cv00108
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying Defendants' Motion for More Definite Statement (Doc. #11 ), Motion to Strike Complaint (Doc. #12 ), and Motion for Discovery (Doc. #13 ). (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/18/2021. (JAMA)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Errata re: #16 Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) by Plaintiffs Kyle Grant, Mariel Grant, Travis Grant.. (Gingras, David)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Kyle Grant, Mariel Grant, Travis Grant . (Gingras, David)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Kyle Grant, Mariel Grant, Travis Grant . (Gingras, David)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Kyle Grant, Mariel Grant, Travis Grant. (Gingras, David)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Travis Grant, Mariel Grant, Kyle Grant.(Gingras, David)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Discovery by Andrew Ivchenko, Renee Ivchenko. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ivchenko, Andrew)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint by Andrew Ivchenko, Renee Ivchenko. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ivchenko, Andrew)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Andrew Ivchenko, Renee Ivchenko. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Ivchenko, Andrew)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kyle Grant, Mariel Grant, Travis Grant: Affidavit of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Andrew Ivchenko on 2/19/2021. (Gingras, David)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/22/2021. (JAMA)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on April 22, 2021. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/22/2021. (JAMA)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew Ivchenko, Renee Ivchenko. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Kyle Grant, Mariel Grant, Travis Grant. (Gingras, David)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Kyle Grant, Mariel Grant, Travis Grant. (Gingras, David)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Travis Grant, Kyle Grant, Mariel Grant. Document not in compliance with Rule 4 of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Only one defendant per summons. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number number 0970-19080483. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00108-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Kyle Grant, Mariel Grant, Travis Grant. (Gingras, David) (SCA)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19080483 filed by Travis Grant, Mariel Grant, Kyle Grant. (Gingras, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-40, #3 Exhibit 41-80, #4 Exhibit 81-120, #5 Exhibit 121-136)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant et al v. Ivchenko et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Ivchenko
Represented By: Andrew Ivchenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Ivchenko
Represented By: Andrew Ivchenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Grant
Represented By: David Scott Gingras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariel Grant
Represented By: David Scott Gingras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Grant
Represented By: David Scott Gingras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?