Williams Law Group PLLC et al v. American Arbitration Association et al
Plaintiff: Williams Law Group PLLC and Andrew Williams
Defendant: Pravati Credit Fund III LP, Janet S. Weinstein PC, American Arbitration Association and Janet S Weinstein
Case Number: 2:2021cv00149
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Filing 67 USCA Case Number re: #66 Notice of Appeal. Case number 22-15364, Ninth Circuit. (BAC)
March 9, 2022 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #64 Order, #65 Clerks Judgment by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number CAZDC-20428470. (Attachments: #1 Supplement CM/ECF Error Notice) (Williams, Andrew)
February 5, 2022 Filing 65 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the Court's Order filed February 5, 2022, which granted the Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby dismissed. (LAD)
February 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) by Defendant Pravati Credit Fund III, LP (Doc. #46 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Supplement Filed by Defendant Pravati Credit Fund III, L.P. on June 11, 2021 [DE 42], and Request for Attorney's Fees (Doc. #43 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate or Modify Arbitration Award (Doc. #50 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Vacate [DE 50] (Doc. #57 ) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Reply in Further Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Vacate or Modify Arbitration Award (Doc. #61 ) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. (See document for further details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/4/2022. (LAD)
November 1, 2021 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #61 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Reply [DE 59] filed by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Williams, Andrew)
October 22, 2021 Filing 62 RESPONSE to Motion re: #61 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Reply [DE 59] filed by Pravati Credit Fund III LP. (Abaie, Ian)
October 18, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Reply [DE 59] by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Williams, Esq. of Shayla Fite, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Andrew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 60 RESPONSE to Motion re: #57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #50 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Pravati Credit Fund III LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(Abaie, Ian)
October 6, 2021 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #50 MOTION to Vacate filed by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Williams, Andrew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Pravati Credit Fund III LP. (Abaie, Ian)
September 28, 2021 Filing 57 *MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #50 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Andrew) *Modified to correct event/ linkage on 9/28/2021 (DXD).
September 17, 2021 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #50 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Pravati Credit Fund III LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-6, #3 Exhibit 7-8, #4 Exhibit 9-25, #5 Exhibit 26-40, #6 Exhibit 41-47, #7 Exhibit 48-49, #8 Exhibit 50 Part 1, #9 Exhibit 50 Part 2, #10 Exhibit 50 Part 3, #11 Exhibit 51-68)(Abaie, Ian)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiffs' Response #54 filed 9/13/2021 is deemed timely filed. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/13/2021. (KFZ)
September 13, 2021 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Williams, Esq., #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Andrew)
September 7, 2021 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Andrew Williams, Esq. re: #50 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award by Plaintiffs Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Williams, Andrew)
September 7, 2021 Filing 52 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - There is no just reason to delay entry of final judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendants American Arbitration Association, Janet S. Weinstein PC, and Janet S. Weinstein. (DXD)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). The Clerk shall enter final judgment of dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) solely as to Defendants American Arbitration Association, Janet S. Weinstein PC and Janet S. Weinstein. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/3/21. (DXD)
September 3, 2021 Filing 50 MOTION to Vacate by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit Exhibit W, #24 Proposed Order)(Williams, Andrew)
August 26, 2021 Filing 49 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Andrew)
August 26, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE re: of Non-Opposition by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC re: #47 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . (Williams, Andrew)
August 17, 2021 Filing 47 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by American Arbitration Association, Janet S. Weinstein PC, Janet S Weinstein. (Beyers, Maureen)
August 12, 2021 Filing 46 *First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Pravati Credit Fund III LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(Abaie, Ian) *Modified to correct motion type on 8/13/2021 (MFR).
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Dismiss. Counts I, II, and III are dismissed with prejudice. Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default (Doc. #27 ) is granted. Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (Doc. #38 , #40 ) are denied. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/26/21. (DXD)
July 20, 2021 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #43 MOTION to Strike #42 Supplement MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Pravati Credit Fund III LP. (Abaie, Ian)
July 6, 2021 Filing 43 *MOTION to Strike #42 Supplement, MOTION for Attorney Fees by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Williams, Esq, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Andrew). *Modified to add motion type on 7/8/2021 (MFR).
June 11, 2021 Filing 42 SUPPLEMENT Notice of Filing Final Arbitration Award by Defendant Pravati Credit Fund III LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Abaie, Ian)
June 1, 2021 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion re: #40 MOTION to Strike #39 Response to Motion filed by Pravati Credit Fund III LP. (Abaie, Ian)
May 18, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION to Strike #39 Response to Motion by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Williams, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Andrew)
April 28, 2021 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re: #38 MOTION to Strike #36 Response to Motion by Pravati Credit Fund III, L.P. filed by Pravati Credit Fund III LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Abaie, Ian)
April 14, 2021 Filing 38 * MOTION to Strike #36 Reply to Response to Motion by Pravati Credit Fund III, L.P. by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Williams, Esq, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Andrew) *Modified to clarify docket text on 4/15/2021 (MFR).
April 2, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #36 Response to Motion. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Please correct future pleadings. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
April 1, 2021 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re: #27 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Pravati Credit Fund III LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex M-Q)(Abaie, Ian)
March 24, 2021 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by American Arbitration Association, Janet S. Weinstein PC, Janet S Weinstein. (Beyers, Maureen)
March 23, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE re: Notice of Filing of Declaration by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC re: #33 Response in Opposition to Motion . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Williams, Esq.)(Williams, Andrew)
March 22, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #27 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury of Adam Golden, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Andrew)
March 22, 2021 Filing 32 REQUEST re: Request for Judicial Notice by Plaintiffs Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibi A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Andrew)
March 17, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Andrew)
March 9, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #29 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Pravati Credit Fund III LP. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
March 8, 2021 Filing 29 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pravati Credit Fund III LP. (Abaie, Ian) *Document not in compliance with Local Rule; attorney noticed on 3/9/2021 (MFR).
March 8, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #27 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Pravati Credit Fund III LP. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
March 5, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Pravati Credit Fund III LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L)(Abaie, Ian)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Stipulation: Defendants shall have an extension to 3/17/21 in which to file a response to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #17 ). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/5/21. (DXD)
March 4, 2021 Filing 25 STIPULATION re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, Andrew)
February 24, 2021 Filing 24 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Pravati Credit Fund III LP. (DXD)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - Plaintiff file a Status Report within 7 days of the date of this Order concerning the status of this matter. The Clerk shall terminate Defendant Pravati Credit Fund III LP on 3/5/21, without further notice if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/24/21. (DXD)
February 24, 2021 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiffs Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC against Pravati Credit Fund III, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Williams, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, Andrew)
February 24, 2021 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon American Arbitration Association, Inc. on 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on American Arbitration Association, Inc.)(Williams, Andrew)
February 24, 2021 Filing 20 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Pravati Credit Fund III, LP on 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Pravati Credit Fund III, LP)(Williams, Andrew)
February 24, 2021 Filing 19 *INCORRECT DOCUMENT - DISREGARD - REFILED AT #21 * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon American Arbitration Association, Inc. on 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on American Arbitration Association, Inc.)(Williams, Andrew) Modified on 2/24/2021 (SLQ).
February 24, 2021 Filing 18 *INCORRECT DOCUMENT - DISREGARD - REFILED AT #20 * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Pravati Credit Fund III, LP on 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Pravati Credit Fund III, LP)(Williams, Andrew) Modified on 2/24/2021 (SLQ).
February 18, 2021 Filing 17 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by American Arbitration Association, Janet S. Weinstein PC, Janet S Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Counsel)(Beyers, Maureen) *Modified to correct event on 2/19/2021 (DXD).
February 17, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Williams, Andrew)
February 12, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Andrew Williams on behalf of Plaintiffs Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #10 ) without prejudice. (See document for complete details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/4/21. (SLQ)
February 4, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janet S. Weinstein PC. (Beyers, Maureen)
February 4, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Arbitration Association. (Beyers, Maureen)
February 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Beyers on behalf of American Arbitration Association, Janet S. Weinstein PC, Janet S Weinstein. (Beyers, Maureen)
February 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 Ex Parte Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - Forms of Papers. Please note for future filings; Attorney filing information must be typed in upper left corner. Please correct future pleadings. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 EX PARTE Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Williams, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, Andrew)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC: Declaration of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Janet S. Weinstein, P.C. on 01/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Williams, Andrew)
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC: Declaration of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Janet S. Weinstein on 01/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Williams, Andrew)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - The Clerk shall terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 4/30/21. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/29/21. (DXD)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Williams Law Group PLLC. (JAM)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1). No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19103095. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-149-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Andrew Williams, Williams Law Group PLLC.(Williams, Andrew) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(JAM)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19103095 filed by Williams Law Group PLLC, Andrew Williams.(Williams, Andrew) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams Law Group PLLC et al v. American Arbitration Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pravati Credit Fund III LP
Represented By: Ian Abrahim Abaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet S. Weinstein PC
Represented By: Michael J Farrell
Represented By: Maureen Beyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Arbitration Association
Represented By: Michael J Farrell
Represented By: Maureen Beyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet S Weinstein
Represented By: Michael J Farrell
Represented By: Maureen Beyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williams Law Group PLLC
Represented By: Andrew Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Williams
Represented By: Andrew Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?