Grech Motors Incorporated v. Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation
Plaintiff: Grech Motors Incorporated
Defendant: Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation a foreign corporation doing business as Wabtec Corporation doing business as Vapor Bus International
Case Number: 2:2021cv00291
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Grech Motors Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 2)(Doyle, William)
April 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Fischer, C)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 2/22/2021. (ESG)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 2/22/2021. (ESG)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 2/22/2021. (ESG)
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grech Motors Incorporated. (Doyle, William)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation. (REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19168866. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00291-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days.Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Grech Motors Incorporated. (REM)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Grech Motors Incorporated.(Doyle, William) (REM)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19168866 filed by Grech Motors Incorporated.(Doyle, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grech Motors Incorporated v. Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation a foreign corporation doing business as Wabtec Corporation doing business as Vapor Bus International
Represented By: C Megan Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grech Motors Incorporated
Represented By: William H Doyle
Represented By: Carlos Andres Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?