Rivera v. Forsythe Family Farms Incorporated
Plaintiff: Gregory Rivera doing business as Rivera Hay Sales
Defendant: Forsythe Family Farms Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00416
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Dismiss. Counts one, three and four of Rivera's complaint are dismissed. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/4/2021. (RMV)
April 28, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Count I (Breach of Oral Argument), Count III (Negligent Misrepresentation), and Count IV (Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing) filed by Forsythe Family Farms Incorporated. (Maziarz, Jessica)
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Count I (Breach of Oral Argument), Count III (Negligent Misrepresentation), and Count IV (Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing) filed by Gregory Rivera. (Foster, Teresa)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Count I (Breach of Oral Argument), Count III (Negligent Misrepresentation), and Count IV (Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing) by Forsythe Family Farms Incorporated. (Maziarz, Jessica)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to the parties' #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, the deadline for Defendant Forsythe Family Farms Incorporated to answer Plaintiff's complaint is extended to and including 4/9/2021. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/31/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (Second Request) by Forsythe Family Farms Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maziarz, Jessica)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to the parties' #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, the deadline for Defendant Forsythe Family Farms Incorporated to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to and including 3/31/2021. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/18/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (First Request) by Forsythe Family Farms Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maziarz, Jessica)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Scheduling Conference is set for June 4, 2021 at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 606, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. In preparation for this Scheduling Conference. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 03/11/2021. (MHW)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The parties are advised, pursuant to LRCiv 12.1(c), that motions to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and motions for judgment on the pleadings under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) are discouraged if the defect(s) in the complaint can be cured by a permissible amendment. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 03/11/2021. (MHW)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19242656. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00416-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Forsythe Family Farms Incorporated. (Maziarz, Jessica) (BAC)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-001681. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0970-19242656 filed by Forsythe Family Farms Incorporated. (Maziarz, Jessica) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement)(BAC)
March 10, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Notice of Service of Process re: Summons, Complaint upon Forsythe Family Farms Incorporated on 2/8/21. (BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Forsythe Family Farms Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Rivera doing business as Rivera Hay Sales
Represented By: Teresa Hughes Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forsythe Family Farms Incorporated
Represented By: Jessica Rae Maziarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?