Swarm Technology LLC v. Amazon.com Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Swarm Technology LLC
Defendant: Amazon Web Services Incorporated and Amazon.com Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00438
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Referring Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Amazon Web Services Incorporated, Amazon.com Incorporated. (Federhar, Andrew)
June 3, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #32 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Amazon Web Services Incorporated, Amazon.com Incorporated. Incorrect PDF attached. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document using the required form(s) attached to docket entry #30 . Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
June 2, 2021 Filing 32 *NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Amazon Web Services Incorporated, Amazon.com Incorporated. (Federhar, Andrew) **Document filed in error, attorney noticed to refile with correct PDF document on 6/3/2021 (MFR).
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER staying discovery in this matter until and including the 21st of June 2021. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/1/2021. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
May 27, 2021 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #29 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (SST)
May 26, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Amazon Web Services Incorporated, Amazon.com Incorporated. (Federhar, Andrew)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for June 1, 2021, is hereby RESET to June 15, 2021, at 10:00 AM and converted to a telephonic conference. Participating counsel shall connect five (5) minutes prior to the hearing by dialing 1-866-390-1828 and entering access code 7618428, when prompted. The remainder of Order setting the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (Doc. #16 ) is AFFIRMED. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/26/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
May 25, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Swarm Technology LLC. (Casey, Timothy)
May 25, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Swarm Technology LLC. (Casey, Timothy)
May 25, 2021 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Swarm Technology LLC. (Casey, Timothy)
May 4, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Gabriel K Bell on behalf of Defendants Amazon Web Services Incorporated, Amazon.com Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
April 28, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for David A Zucker, Kimberly Q Li, Adam Michael Greenfield, Maximilian A Grant on behalf of Defendants Amazon Web Services Incorporated, Amazon.com Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 2, 2021 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com Incorporated. (Federhar, Andrew)
April 2, 2021 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon Web Services Incorporated. (Federhar, Andrew)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint for Patent Infringement (Doc. #20 ) is APPROVED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than May 28, 2021. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/1/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
April 1, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Amazon Web Services Incorporated, Amazon.com Incorporated. (LFIG)
April 1, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT by Amazon Web Services Incorporated, Amazon.com Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Federhar, Andrew)
April 1, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Mark Federhar on behalf of Amazon Web Services Incorporated, Amazon.com Incorporated. (Federhar, Andrew)
March 26, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #17 Notice (Other) filed by Swarm Technology LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Timothy Casey but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Michael Kelly. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
March 26, 2021 Filing 17 *NOTICE re: Notice of Filing Affidavits of Service of Court's March 25, 2021 Order by Swarm Technology LLC re: #16 Order, Set/Reset Hearings . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on Amazon.com, Inc., #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on Amazon Web Services, Inc.)(Kelly, Michael) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation on 3/30/2021 (SST).
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 6/1/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/25/2021. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
March 23, 2021 Filing 15 *SERVICE EXECUTED re: Affidavit of Service by Swarm Technology LLC . (Kelly, Michael) *Modified to reflect correct event on 3/24/2021 (MFR).
March 22, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Swarm Technology LLC. (Kelly, Michael)
March 18, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Court's Order by Swarm Technology LLC re: #11 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Kelly, Michael)
March 18, 2021 Filing 12 *SERVICE EXECUTED re: Affidavit of Service by Swarm Technology LLC . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on Amazon.com, Inc., #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on Amazon Web Services, Inc.)(Kelly, Michael) *Modified to reflect correct event; attorney noticed on 3/19/2021 (SST).
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/17/2021. (LFIG)
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-438-PHX-DJH. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Swarm Technology LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Amazon Web Services Incorporated, Amazon.com Incorporated. (JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(JAM)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19251108. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-438-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (JAM)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Swarm Technology LLC. (Kelly, Michael) (JAM)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Swarm Technology LLC. (JAM)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19251108 filed by Swarm Technology LLC. (Kelly, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M, #2 Exhibit N-V, #3 Exhibit W Part 1, #4 Exhibit W Part 2, #5 Exhibit X Part 1, #6 Exhibit X Part 2, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swarm Technology LLC v. Amazon.com Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services Incorporated
Represented By: Kimberly Q Li
Represented By: Gabriel K Bell
Represented By: Andrew Mark Federhar
Represented By: Adam Michael Greenfield
Represented By: Maximilian A Grant
Represented By: Jessica Anne Gale
Represented By: David A Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Incorporated
Represented By: Kimberly Q Li
Represented By: Gabriel K Bell
Represented By: Andrew Mark Federhar
Represented By: Adam Michael Greenfield
Represented By: Maximilian A Grant
Represented By: Jessica Anne Gale
Represented By: David A Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swarm Technology LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Reed Willis
Represented By: Leo R Beus
Represented By: Timothy James Casey
Represented By: Michael K Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?