ME SPE Franchising LLC v. NCW Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: ME SPE Franchising LLC
Defendant: Envy One LLC, NCW Holdings LLC, Christine Winkelvoss and Nicole Connor
Case Number: 2:2021cv00458
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #20 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (SST)
May 12, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re: #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Envy One LLC, NCW Holdings LLC, Christine Winkelvoss. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Winklevoss)(Peabody, Daniel)
May 12, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NCW Holdings LLC. (Peabody, Daniel)
May 12, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Envy One LLC. (Peabody, Daniel)
May 12, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Envy One LLC, NCW Holdings LLC, Christine Winkelvoss.(Peabody, Daniel)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Before the Court is the Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer and Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #18 ). This is Defendants' second requested extension. For good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED approving the Stipulation (Doc. #18 ). Defendants shall have until May 12, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no additional extensions to these filings will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/5/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
May 5, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Envy One LLC, NCW Holdings LLC, Christine Winkelvoss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peabody, Daniel)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Before the Court is the Defendants' Motion to Extend Time (Doc. #16 ) in which to Answer the Complaint and respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants' counsel represents that he has spoken with Plaintiff's counsel about the requested extension but not received a response. The Court nevertheless finds good cause to grant the extension without Plaintiff's response. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Motion (Doc. #16 ) is granted. Defendants shall have until May 5, 2021, to answer Plaintiff's Complaint and to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/22/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
April 21, 2021 Filing 16 *First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Envy One LLC, NCW Holdings LLC, Christine Winkelvoss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peabody, Daniel) *Modified to add motion type on 4/22/2021 (MFR).
April 21, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel John Fisher Peabody on behalf of Envy One LLC, NCW Holdings LLC, Christine Winkelvoss. (Peabody, Daniel)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 6/15/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/5/2021. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME SPE Franchising LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Order (Dkt 8), Corporate Disclosure Statement, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark upon Nicole Connor on 3/31/2021. (Benveniste, Katherine)
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME SPE Franchising LLC: Certificate of Mailing re: Summons, Complaint, Order (Dkt 8), Corporate Disclosure Statement, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark upon Christine Winkelvoss on 3/31/2021. (Benveniste, Katherine)
April 5, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME SPE Franchising LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Order (Dkt 8), Corporate Disclosure Statement, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark upon Envy One, LLC on 3/31/2021. (Benveniste, Katherine)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME SPE Franchising LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Order (Dkt 8), Corporate Disclosure Statement, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark upon NCW Holdings, LLC on 3/31/2021. (Benveniste, Katherine)
April 1, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John F Verhey on behalf of Plaintiff ME SPE Franchising LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ME SPE Franchising LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Benveniste, Katherine)
March 31, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Nancy Nguyen Sims on behalf of Plaintiff ME SPE Franchising LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/22/2021. (LFIG)
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Nicole Connor, Envy One LLC, NCW Holdings LLC, Christine Winkelvoss. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by ME SPE Franchising LLC.(Benveniste, Katherine) (REM)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(REM)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19264088. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00458-PHX-DJH. Magistrate Election form attached. (REM)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by ME SPE Franchising LLC.(Benveniste, Katherine) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(REM)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ME SPE Franchising LLC.(Benveniste, Katherine) (REM)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19264088 filed by ME SPE Franchising LLC. (Benveniste, Katherine) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ME SPE Franchising LLC v. NCW Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envy One LLC
Represented By: Daniel John Fisher Peabody
Represented By: Jimmie W Pursell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCW Holdings LLC
Represented By: Daniel John Fisher Peabody
Represented By: Jimmie W Pursell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Winkelvoss
Represented By: Daniel John Fisher Peabody
Represented By: Jimmie W Pursell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ME SPE Franchising LLC
Represented By: Katherine L Benveniste
Represented By: John F Verhey
Represented By: Nancy Nguyen Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?