Young et al v. Chemguard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Landon Young and Heather Young
Defendant: LN Curtis & Sons Incorporated, Chemguard Incorporated, Matlock Enterprises Incorporated, Angus Fire LTD, Tyco Fire Products LP, Perimeter Solutions LP and Angus Fire Limited
Case Number: 2:2021cv00568
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 42 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Remand Letter.from Clerk's Office, Maricopa County Superior Court. (REK)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER VACATING CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - That the Panel's Conditional Transfer Order Designated as "CTO-50" filed on April 8, 2021, is VACATED. (MAP)
May 27, 2021 Filing 40 USCA Case Number re: #39 Notice of Appeal. Case number 21-15912, Ninth Circuit. (SST)
May 25, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #36 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court by Chemguard Incorporated, LN Curtis & Sons Incorporated, Matlock Enterprises Incorporated, Perimeter Solutions LP, Tyco Fire Products LP. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-19503661. (Landolt, Lukas)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying as moot Defendants' #37 Motion for an Order Implementing Automatic Stay. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/25/21. (CLB)
May 24, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION to Stay re: #36 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Defendants' Motion for An Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 62(a) by Chemguard Incorporated, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landolt, Lukas)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Doc. #30 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall remand this case to Maricopa County Superior Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Perimeter Solutions LP's Motion to Stay (Doc. #24 ) is denied as moot. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/21/21. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (SST)
May 21, 2021 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #30 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Heather Young, Landon Young. (Burge, Jason)
May 18, 2021 Filing 34 Service Returned Unexecuted as to Angus Fire. (SST)
May 14, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #30 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Chemguard Incorporated, LN Curtis & Sons Incorporated, Matlock Enterprises Incorporated, Perimeter Solutions LP, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-12)(Landolt, Lukas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 32 *REPLY to Response to Motion re: #24 MOTION to Stay Pending JPML's Decision on Transfer to the MDL filed by Perimeter Solutions LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Thurlow, Matthew) *Modified to correct filer; attorney noticed on 5/12/2021 (SST).
May 5, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #24 MOTION to Stay Pending JPML's Decision on Transfer to the MDL filed by Heather Young, Landon Young. (Burge, Jason)
April 30, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Heather Young, Landon Young. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burge, Jason)
April 30, 2021 Filing 29 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Heather Young, Landon Young. (Burge, Jason)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The parties' Joint Motion to Vacate the Case Management Conference #26 is granted and the Rule 16 Case Management Conference, presently set for May 14, 2021 before Honorable Steven P. Logan, is vacated. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/28/2021. (LMR)
April 27, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Vacate 5/14/21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION REQUESTED) by Chemguard Incorporated, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landolt, Lukas)
April 26, 2021 Filing 28 Service Returned Unexecuted as to Angus Fire Limited. (SST)
April 23, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Heather Young, Landon Young. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burge, Jason)
April 21, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Pending JPML's Decision on Transfer to the MDL by Perimeter Solutions LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Thurlow, Matthew)
April 16, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE re: Service of ECF Record Document 11 by Heather Young, Landon Young re: #11 Order . (Burge, Jason)
April 15, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kerry James Miller, Jason Walker Burge, Danielle Christine Teutonico on behalf of Plaintiffs Heather Young, Landon Young. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
April 12, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Errata by Defendant LN Curtis & Sons Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Ormond, Jill)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation (Doc. #17 ) is granted. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/8/21. (SST)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 5/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P. Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
April 7, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LN Curtis & Sons Incorporated. (Ormond, Jill)
April 7, 2021 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tyco Fire Products LP. (Landolt, Lukas)
April 7, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (FIRST REQUEST) by Chemguard Incorporated, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landolt, Lukas)
April 6, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Perimeter Solutions LP identifying Corporate Parent Perimeter Solutions North America, Inc. for Perimeter Solutions LP. (Thurlow, Matthew)
April 6, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Thurlow on behalf of Perimeter Solutions LP. (Thurlow, Matthew)
April 6, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Matthew David Thurlow on behalf of Defendant Perimeter Solutions LP. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 5, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Matlock Enterprises Incorporated. (Briggs, Sharon)
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Matlock Enterprises Incorporated. (Briggs, Sharon)
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Matlock Enterprises Incorporated.(Briggs, Sharon)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (PRELIMINARY) - Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/2/21. (NKS)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Matlock Enterprises Incorporated. (MCO)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Perimeter Solutions LP. (MCO)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Angus Fire LTD. (MCO)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to LN Curtis & Sons Incorporated. (MCO)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Tyco Fire Products LP. (MCO)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19315593. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-568-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemguard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International PLC for Chemguard Incorporated. (Landolt, Lukas) (MCO)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE re: Verification by Chemguard Incorporated. (Landolt, Lukas) (MCO)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-017108. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19315593 filed by Chemguard Incorporated. (Landolt, Lukas) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al v. Chemguard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LN Curtis & Sons Incorporated
Represented By: William Shelley
Represented By: Jill J Ormond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Incorporated
Represented By: Eric Bowen Johnson
Represented By: Lukas Mark Landolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matlock Enterprises Incorporated
Represented By: Sharon Angela Briggs
Represented By: Mitchell J Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus Fire LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Eric Bowen Johnson
Represented By: Lukas Mark Landolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perimeter Solutions LP
Represented By: Matthew David Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus Fire Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landon Young
Represented By: Patrick J McGroder, IV
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Jason Walker Burge
Represented By: Patrick J McGroder
Represented By: Danielle Christine Teutonico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Young
Represented By: Patrick J McGroder, IV
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Jason Walker Burge
Represented By: Patrick J McGroder
Represented By: Danielle Christine Teutonico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?