Top Brand LLC et al v. Cozy Comfort Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sky Creations, LLC, E Star LLC, Flying Star LLC, Top Brand LLC and Sky Creations LLC
Defendant: Brian Speciale, Michael Speciale and Cozy Comfort Company LLC
Cross Defendant: John Ngan and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2021cv00597
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : 7-12 by Cozy Comfort Company LLC, Brian Speciale, Michael Speciale. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sitrick, Gregory)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 *ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM re: #43 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS OF COUNTERCLAIM-DEFENDANT JOHN NGAN) against Cozy Comfort Company LLC, Brian Speciale, Michael Speciale by John Ngan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Londen, Phillip) *Modified to add linkage on 6/4/2021 (SST).
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by E Star LLC, Flying Star LLC, Sky Creations LLC, Top Brand LLC. (Londen, Phillip)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Cozy Comfort Company LLC, Brian Speciale, Michael Speciale: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Answer to First Amended Complaint upon John Ngan on May 12 and 14, 2021. (Sitrick, Gregory)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #62 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (REK)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 AMENDED COMPLAINT [SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT] against All Defendants filed by Top Brand LLC, Flying Star LLC, Sky Creations LLC, E Star LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E, #2 Exhibit Exhibits F-I, #3 Exhibit Exhibit J-M)(Londen, Phillip)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #52 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a clean copy of the Second Amended Complaint in compliance with this Order by Tuesday, May 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/20/2021. (CLB)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #52 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT] filed by E Star LLC, Flying Star LLC, Sky Creations LLC, Top Brand LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Londen, Phillip)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #52 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Cozy Comfort Company LLC, Brian Speciale, Michael Speciale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sitrick, Gregory)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 6/29/2021 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P. Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by E Star LLC, Flying Star LLC, Sky Creations, LLC, Top Brand LLC. (Londen, Phillip)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE re: Service by E Star LLC, Flying Star LLC, Sky Creations, LLC, Top Brand LLC re: #44 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions [NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY ORDER]. (Londen, Phillip)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #54 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (REK)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 *ANSWER to #43 Answer to Counterclaim [ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF TOP BRAND LLC, SKY CREATIONS LLC, E-STAR LLC, AND FLYING STAR LLC] by E Star LLC, Flying Star LLC, Sky Creations, LLC, Top Brand LLC.(Londen, Phillip) *Modified to correct text on 4/30/2021 (MHW).
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw (Doc. #50 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the law firm of Quarles & Brady LLP and attorney Christian G. Stahl, are withdrawn as counsel for Defendants Cozy Comfort, LLC, Brian Speciale, and Michael Speciale in this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Cozy Comfort, LLC, Brian Speciale, and Michael Speciale shall remain represented by Messner Reeves LLP and attorney Gregory P. Sitrick. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/28/2021. (LAD)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by E Star LLC, Flying Star LLC, John Ngan, Sky Creations, LLC, Top Brand LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Exhibits A - E, #2 Exhibit 1 - Exhibits F - 1, #3 Exhibit 1 - Exhibits J - M, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Fraser, Eric)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Michael Fraser on behalf of E Star LLC, Flying Star LLC, John Ngan, Sky Creations, LLC, Top Brand LLC. (Fraser, Eric)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cozy Comfort Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stahl, Christian)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Matthew L DePreter on behalf of Counter Defendants Sky Creations, LLC, Top Brand LLC, Plaintiffs Sky Creations, LLC, Top Brand LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christopher W Niro on behalf of Plaintiffs Sky Creations, LLC, Top Brand LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for William Luciano Niro on behalf of Plaintiffs Sky Creations, LLC, Top Brand LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Summons Issued as to John Ngan. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SUMMONS Submitted by Cozy Comfort Company LLC. (Sitrick, Gregory)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cozy Comfort Company LLC. (Sitrick, Gregory)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Cozy Comfort Company LLC. (Sitrick, Gregory)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #43 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (REK)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/8/2021. (LMR)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 *ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Brian Speciale, Cozy Comfort Company LLC, Michael Speciale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Sitrick, Gregory) *Modified to correct text on 4/30/2021 (MHW).
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Letter Re Transfer of 1:20-cv-01238-RRP from the Northern District of Illinois to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-21-00597-PHX-SPL. (MAP)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-01238 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TRANSFERRED to the District of Arizona the electronic record.(ec, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 3/24/2021. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The court grants in part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Transfer this Action to Arizona #30 . Count IV of the FAC is dismissed without prejudice. The remaining claims are transferred to the District of Arizona under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Defendants' requests for dismissal under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3), and for transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), are terminated as moot. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/24/2021. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY by Cozy Comfort Company, LLC, Brian Speciale, Michael Speciale to MOTION by Defendants Brian Speciale, Cozy Comfort Company, LLC, Michael Speciale to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #30 Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and to Transfer this Action to Arizona (Sitrick, Gregory) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM by E Star LLC, Flying Star LLC, Sky Creations, LLC, Top Brand LLC in Opposition to motion to dismiss #30 (De Preter, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk8, Docket) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendant's motion to dismiss Count IV and to transfer this action to Arizona #30 is entered and continued for briefing: Plaintiff's response to be filed by July 31, 2020; reply, if any, due on August 14, 2020. Motion hearing date of July 13, 2020 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory P Sitrick for presentment of motion to dismiss #30 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/13/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Sitrick, Gregory) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT by Defendants Cozy Comfort Company, LLC, Brian Speciale, Michael Speciale in Support of MOTION by Defendants Brian Speciale, Cozy Comfort Company, LLC, Michael Speciale to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #30 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sitrick, Gregory) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by Cozy Comfort Company, LLC, Brian Speciale, Michael Speciale in support of motion to dismiss #30 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Sitrick, Gregory) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION by Defendants Brian Speciale, Cozy Comfort Company, LLC, Michael Speciale to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Sitrick, Gregory) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: The court thanks Defendants for their prompt response to the court's order. Motion to transfer venue #20 is deemed withdrawn without prejudice to Defendants' response to the amended complaint, to be filed as directed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 15. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Notice in Response to June 22, 2020 Minute Order by Cozy Comfort Company, LLC, Brian Speciale, Michael Speciale (Sitrick, Gregory) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: In lieu of a response to the motion to transfer venue #20 , Plaintiff has submitted an amended complaint. Defendant is directed to advise the court, on or before the date now set for reply memo, whether Defendant will stand on its motion. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED complaint by Top Brand LLC, Sky Creations, LLC, E Star LLC, Flying Star LLC against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(De Preter, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendants have moved to dismiss Plaintiffs' complaint for failure to state a claim #20 . They also move for transfer of this case to the District of Arizona "where jurisdiction and venue are proper, and for the convenience of parties and witnesses." Plaintiffs are directed to respond to the motion for transfer on or before June 18, 2020; Defendants' reply, if any, to be filed on June 25, 2020. The court will rule by mail. Motion hearing date of 6/1/2020 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cozy Comfort Company, LLC, Brian Speciale, Michael Speciale (Sitrick, Gregory) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory P Sitrick for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #20 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/1/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Sitrick, Gregory) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM by Cozy Comfort Company, LLC, Brian Speciale, Michael Speciale in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #20 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael Speciale)(Sitrick, Gregory) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Cozy Comfort Company, LLC, Brian Speciale, Michael Speciale (Sitrick, Gregory) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cozy Comfort Company, LLC, Brian Speciale, Michael Speciale by Gregory P Sitrick (Sitrick, Gregory) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cozy Comfort Company, LLC, Brian Speciale, Michael Speciale by Christian G. Stahl (Stahl, Christian) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STATUS Report Per 04/24/2020 COVID-19 Order by Sky Creations, LLC, Top Brand LLC (De Preter, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket8, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTIFICATION AS TO AFFILIATES OF PLAINTIFFS TOP BRAND LLC AND SKY CREATIONS, LLC by Sky Creations, LLC, Top Brand LLC (De Preter, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 4/29/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Top Brand LLC. (Niro, Christopher) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Top Brand LLC. (Niro, Christopher) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Top Brand LLC. (Niro, Christopher) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that 20 CV 1238, Top Brand, LLC et al v. Cozy Comfort Company, LLC et al., before the Hon. Sharon Johnson Coleman, has been identified for transfer to the Patent Case Pilot Program in which this Court is participating; therefore It is hereby ordered that 20 CV 1238, Top Brand, LLC et al v. Cozy Comfort Company, LLC et al., is to be reassigned by lot to one of the district judges participating in the pilot program. Case reassigned to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/26/2020.(pk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (kp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Cozy Comfort Company, LLC (dxb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Brian Speciale, Michael Speciale (dxb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Clerk of Court is to arrange for this case to be transferred to the Patent Case Pilot Program. Mailed notice. (ym, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sky Creations, LLC, Top Brand LLC by Matthew L. De Preter (De Preter, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sky Creations, LLC, Top Brand LLC by William Luciano Niro (Niro, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sky Creations, LLC, Top Brand LLC by Christopher William Niro (Niro, Christopher) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Niro, Christopher) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Top Brand LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16745730. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Niro, Christopher) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Top Brand LLC et al v. Cozy Comfort Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sky Creations, LLC
Represented By: William Luciano Niro
Represented By: Matthew L De Preter
Represented By: Christopher W Niro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E Star LLC
Represented By: Matthew L De Preter
Represented By: Christopher W Niro
Represented By: Eric Michael Fraser
Represented By: Matthew L DePreter
Represented By: Phillip Winston Londen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flying Star LLC
Represented By: Matthew L De Preter
Represented By: Christopher W Niro
Represented By: Eric Michael Fraser
Represented By: Matthew L DePreter
Represented By: Phillip Winston Londen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Top Brand LLC
Represented By: William Luciano Niro
Represented By: Matthew L De Preter
Represented By: Christopher W Niro
Represented By: Eric Michael Fraser
Represented By: Matthew L DePreter
Represented By: Phillip Winston Londen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sky Creations LLC
Represented By: William Luciano Niro
Represented By: Christopher W Niro
Represented By: Eric Michael Fraser
Represented By: Matthew L DePreter
Represented By: Phillip Winston Londen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Speciale
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Sitrick
Represented By: Christian Guillermo Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Speciale
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Sitrick
Represented By: Christian Guillermo Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cozy Comfort Company LLC
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Sitrick
Represented By: Christian Guillermo Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: John Ngan
Represented By: William Luciano Niro
Represented By: Christopher W Niro
Represented By: Eric Michael Fraser
Represented By: Matthew L DePreter
Represented By: Phillip Winston Londen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?