Robinson v. Corizon Health Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jason Robinson
Defendant: Centurion Managed Care of Arizona LLC (FN), Centurion of Arizona LLC, Corizon LLC, Unknown Parties, Centurion Detention Health Services LLC and Corizon Health Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00608
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles (PS)
Referring Judge: Camille D Bibles
2 Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the stipulated motion at ECF No. #13 is granted. Accordingly, the telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for June 3, 2021 is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 5/27/21. (SST)
May 26, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Vacate #11 Order, Set/Reset Hearings Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference set for June 3, 2021 by Jason Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Griffiths, Scott)
May 21, 2021 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jason Robinson: Acceptance of Service re: Acceptance of Service upon Centurion of Arizona LLC and Dr. Rodney & Jane Doe Stewart on May 10, 2021. (Griffiths, Scott)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a telephonic scheduling conference is set for Thursday, June 3, 2021 at 12:00 P.M. The parties shall participate in the scheduling conference telephonically, which shall be conducted from the Magistrate Judge's chambers and not the courtroom and will not be conducted on the record. See attachment for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 5/3/2021. (CLB)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the status hearing set for May 12, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Camille D. Bibles is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 4/30/21. (SST)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Corizon Health Incorporated, Corizon LLC. (Karvis, Mandi)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Corizon Health Incorporated, Corizon LLC.(Karvis, Mandi)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED setting a telephonic status hearing in this case for Wednesday, May 12, 2021 at 1:00 P.M. before Magistrate Judge Camille Bibles. Counsel will be provided with the conference call information via email. The telephonic status hearing will be off the record and counsel is advised that their clients do not need to appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 4/27/21. (SST)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Defendants John and Jane Does 1-100, White Partnerships 1-100, and Black Corporations 1-100, are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff must either serve or seek a waiver of service from the remaining unserved Defendants. If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on an unserved Defendant within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed as to that Defendant. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Defendants must answer the Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This matter is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Camille D. Bibles pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). (See Order for full details.) Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/19/21. (SST)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corizon LLC. (Karvis, Mandi)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corizon Health Incorporated. (Karvis, Mandi)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Corizon Health Incorporated, Corizon LLC. (BAC)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (BAC)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-003036. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0970-19341239 filed by Corizon LLC, Corizon Health Incorporated. (Karvis, Mandi) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit 3 - Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4 - Remainder of State Court Record, #6 5 - Attorney Verification)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Corizon Health Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Managed Care of Arizona LLC (FN)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Arizona LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon LLC
Represented By: Isaiah X Herrera
Represented By: Mandi Jean Karvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Detention Health Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Incorporated
Represented By: Isaiah X Herrera
Represented By: Mandi Jean Karvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Robinson
Represented By: Scott Andrew Griffiths
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?