Randolph et al v. Pravati SPV II LLC et al
Plaintiff: Law Office of Justin G Randolph and Justin G Randolph
Defendant: Hoyt Neal, Robert Binkley, Ian Abaie, Alexander Chucri, Arbitrage Capital Ventures LLC, Binkley Properties LLC, Pravati Capital LLC and Pravati SPV II LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00713
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The Court having granted Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default; IT IS ORDERED denying as moot Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. (Doc. #20 ) Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/17/21. (MAW)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - 1. The Court hereby GRANTS the Movants' Motion (Doc. #22 ); 2. The Clerk's default entered against the Movants on or about June 7, 2021 (Docket No. #18 ) is hereby set aside. 3. Movants shall have 10 days from the date of this Order to file a response to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/17/21. (SMH)
June 11, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re: #22 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Law Office of Justin G Randolph. (Randolph, Justin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Arbitrage Capital Ventures LLC, Binkley Properties LLC, Pravati Capital LLC, Pravati SPV II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - C, #2 Exhibit Exhibits D - E, #3 Exhibit Exhibits F - H, #4 Exhibit Exhibits I - K, #5 Exhibit Exhibits L - O, #6 Exhibit Exhibits P - U, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Freiberg, Bruce)
June 9, 2021 Filing 21 *ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT TO MAIN DOCUMENT (Proposed Order) by Plaintiff Law Office of Justin G Randolph against Pravati SPV II, LLC, Pravati Capital, LLC, Arbitrage Capital Ventures, LLC, and Binkley Properties, LLC. (Randolph, Justin) *Modified to correct event on 6/10/2021 (WLP).
June 9, 2021 Filing 20 *MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Law Office of Justin G Randolph against Pravati SPV II, LLC, Pravati Capital, LLC, Arbitrage Capital Ventures, LLC, and Binkley Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit with Table)(Randolph, Justin) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 6/10/2021 (WLP).
June 9, 2021 Filing 19 *Re-filed at #20 APPLICATION for Entry of Default Judgment under FRCP 55(b)(1) by Plaintiff Law Office of Justin G Randolph against Pravati SPV II, LLC, Pravati Capital, LLC, Arbitrage Capital Ventures, LLC, and Binkley Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit with Table)(Randolph, Justin) *Modified on 6/10/2021 (WLP).
June 7, 2021 Filing 18 **SET ASIDE pursuant to #24 ** Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Arbitrage Capital Ventures LLC, Binkley Properties LLC, Pravati Capital LLC, Pravati SPV II LLC. (WLP) Modified on 6/17/2021 (SMH).
June 4, 2021 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT by Law Office of Justin G Randolph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Randolph, Justin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Law Office of Justin G Randolph: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint with USPS Tracking upon Pravati SPV II, LLC, Pravati Capital, LLC, Arbitrage Capital Ventures, LLC, Binkley Properties, LLC on 04/29/2021 & 04/30/2021. (Randolph, Justin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 15 *APPLICATION for Entry of Default as to Pravati SPV II, LLC, Pravati Capital, LLC, Arbitrage Capital Ventures, LLC, Binkley Properties, LLC by Law Office of Justin G Randolph. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Randolph, Justin) *Modified to correct event on 6/7/2021 (WLP).
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the Plaintiff file a status report within 7 days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter will be dismissed as to Defendants Pravati SPV II, LLC, Pravati Capital LLC, Binkley Properties, LLC, and Arbitrage Capital Ventures, LLC without further notice 7 days from the date of this Order if counsel fails to file a status report [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/3/21. (MAW)
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Law Office of Justin G Randolph: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Corporation/Corporate Officer/Arbitrage Capital Ventures, LLC on 04/29/2021. (Randolph, Justin) *Modified to request proof of service, attorney noticed on 6/3/2021 (LAD).
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Law Office of Justin G Randolph: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Registered Agent/Corporate Officer/Binkley Properties, LLC on 04/30/2021. (Randolph, Justin) *Modified to request proof of service, attorney noticed on 6/3/2021 (LAD).
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Law Office of Justin G Randolph: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Registered Agent/Pravati Capital, LLC on 04/30/2021. (Randolph, Justin) *Modified to request proof of service, attorney noticed on 6/3/2021 (LAD).
June 2, 2021 Filing 10 * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Law Office of Justin G Randolph: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Registered Agent/Pravati SPV II, LLC on 04/30/2021. (Randolph, Justin) *Modified to request proof of service, attorney noticed on 6/3/2021 (LAD).
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Law Office of Justin G Randolph . (Randolph, Justin)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Amended Complaint filed by Law Office of Justin G Randolph. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type (not all caps). Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use event Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) and attach a copy of the amended pleading that indicates in what respect it differs from the pleading which it amends, by bracketing or striking through the text that was deleted and underlining the text that was added. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants filed by Law Office of Justin G Randolph.(Randolph, Justin)
April 26, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Justin G Randolph on behalf of Plaintiffs Law Office of Justin G Randolph, Justin G Randolph. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Justin G Randolph, Law Office of Justin G Randolph. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ian Abaie, Arbitrage Capital Ventures LLC, Robert Binkley, Binkley Properties LLC, Alexander Chucri, Law Office of Justin G Randolph, Hoyt Neal, Pravati Capital LLC, Pravati SPV II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19391502. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00713-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Law Office of Justin G Randolph, Justin G Randolph. (Randolph, Justin) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(BAC)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Law Office of Justin G Randolph. (Randolph, Justin) (BAC)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0970-19391502 filed by Law Office of Justin G Randolph, Justin G Randolph. (Randolph, Justin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randolph et al v. Pravati SPV II LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Office of Justin G Randolph
Represented By: Justin G Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin G Randolph
Represented By: Justin G Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyt Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Binkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Abaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Chucri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arbitrage Capital Ventures LLC
Represented By: Bruce Carl Freiberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Binkley Properties LLC
Represented By: Bruce Carl Freiberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pravati Capital LLC
Represented By: Bruce Carl Freiberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pravati SPV II LLC
Represented By: Bruce Carl Freiberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?