Fuentes v. Planet Fitness
Plaintiff: Pete Fuentes
Defendant: Planet Fitness
Case Number: 2:2021cv00818
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Planet Fitness. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Rocush, Erica)
May 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE re: PENDING MOTIONS IN MARICOPA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, PURSUANT TO LRCIV 3.6(d) by Planet Fitness re: 6 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) . (Rocush, Erica)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Scheduling Conference is set for August 3, 2021 at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 606, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/10/2021. (WLP)
May 10, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Planet Fitness.(Rocush, Erica)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/7/2021. (RMV)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Planet Fitness identifying Corporate Parent UNITED PF HOLDINGS, LLC for Planet Fitness. (Rocush, Erica)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal - CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Planet Fitness. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Rocush, Erica)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Document not in compliance with LRCiv 3.6(d). FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file a "Notice" of Pending Motion. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Planet Fitness. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new removal case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Planet Fitness. (ARC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (ARC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19443587. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-818-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-015758. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19443587 filed by Planet Fitness. (Rocush, Erica) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ARC)
May 7, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Planet Fitness on 4/30/2021. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 4/30/2021) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuentes v. Planet Fitness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Fitness
Represented By: Erica K Rocush
Represented By: Nicholas J Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?