Gregory v. Gust Rosenfeld PLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeane Gregory
Defendant: Superior Court of Arizona, Gust Rosenfeld PLC, Arizona State Bar Association and Maricopa County Attorney
Case Number: 2:2021cv00877
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 19 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment - State Bar of Arizona by Plaintiff Jeane Gregory. (LAD) (59 pages)
June 16, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment - State Bar of Arizona by Jeane Gregory. (LAD) (11 pages)
June 16, 2021 Filing 17 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Superior Court of Arizona, Maricopa County, by Plaintiff Jeane Gregory. (LAD) (42 pages)
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Superior Court of Arizona, Maricopa County, by Jeane Gregory. (LAD) (7 pages)
June 16, 2021 Filing 15 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Maricopa County Attorney by Plaintiff Jeane Gregory. (LAD) (25 pages)
June 16, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Maricopa County Attorney by Jeane Gregory. (LAD) (5 pages)
June 16, 2021 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re: #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Gust Rosenfeld PLC by Plaintiff Jeane Gregory. (LAD) (49 pages)
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Gust Rosenfeld PLC by Jeane Gregory. (LAD) (7 pages)
June 16, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Jeane Gregory, listing documents and inquiring about electronic filing (free look and PACER). (LAD) (1 page)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 06/10/2021. (MHW)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) Plaintiff's Complaint against all Defendants is dismissed with leave to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff elects not to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action without further Order of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint the complaint may not be served until and unless the Court screens the amended complaint pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 06/09/2021. (MHW)
June 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Jeane Gregory. (5 pages) (MHW)
June 8, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Jeane Gregory. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (1 page) (MHW)
May 26, 2021 Summons Issued as to Arizona State Bar Association, Maricopa County Attorney and mailed to plaintiff on 5/27/2021. (BAS) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Jeane Gregory. Parties must be named on the Summons exactly as they are named in the Complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Please submit Summonses for the Maricopa County Attorney and Arizona State Bar Association (named as Arizona State Bar) which are named exactly as in the Complaint. The Summonses submitted do not name these parties the same as in the Complaint. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD)
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gust Rosenfeld PLC, Superior Court of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LAD) (2 total)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (LAD)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX228844. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00877-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (LAD)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Jeane Gregory. (LAD) (4 pages)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number PHX228844 filed by Jeane Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAD) (6 pages)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Gust Rosenfeld PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeane Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gust Rosenfeld PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona State Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?