Moreland et al v. Precision Housing Distributor LLC
Plaintiff: Rosa Acosta, Jessica Rockwell, Andra Cheri Moreland and Brenda Geiger
Defendant: Precision Housing Distributor LLC an Arizona limited liability doing business as T & As Cabaret
Case Number: 2:2021cv01007
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Having reviewed Defendant's Notice #18 , the Court's Order #17 is satisfied and no further action will be taken by the Court at this time. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/26/21. (SJF)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER issued: Scheduling Conference set for 9/7/2021 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See Order for further details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/26/21. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Case Management Order) (SJF)
July 26, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Precision Housing Distributor LLC. (Curran, Michael)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Defendant shall show cause as to why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to submit the requisite form to the Clerk's Office no later than July 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/26/21. (SJF)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: PRELIMINARY ORDER issued governing the proceedings in this case. Please review for all details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/21/21. (SJF)
July 21, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-1007-PHX-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 21, 2021 Filing 14 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 8, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #10 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. (LAD)
July 7, 2021 Filing 11 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Precision Housing Distributor LLC.(Curran, Michael)
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rosa Acosta, Brenda Geiger, Andra Cheri Moreland, Jessica Rockwell: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint upon Michael Curran for Precision Housing on 6/16/21. (Hoffman, Amy)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Rosa Acosta, Brenda Geiger, Andra Cheri Moreland, Jessica Rockwell. (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(Casas, Joseph)
June 14, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Joseph N Casas, John V Golaszewski on behalf of Plaintiffs Rosa Acosta, Brenda Geiger, Andra Cheri Moreland, Jessica Rockwell. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil Cover sheet by Plaintiffs Rosa Acosta, Brenda Geiger, Andra Cheri Moreland, Jessica Rockwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoffman, Amy)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Andra Cheri Moreland, Rosa Acosta, Brenda Geiger, Jessica Rockwell. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please re-file the Civil Cover Sheet, using the correct format. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(BAC)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Precision Housing Distributor LLC. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19551266. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01007-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Rosa Acosta, Brenda Geiger, Andra Cheri Moreland, Jessica Rockwell. (Hoffman, Amy) (BAC)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0970-19551266 filed by Andra Cheri Moreland, Rosa Acosta, Jessica Rockwell, Brenda Geiger. (Hoffman, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreland et al v. Precision Housing Distributor LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Acosta
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Rockwell
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andra Cheri Moreland
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Geiger
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Housing Distributor LLC an Arizona limited liability doing business as T & As Cabaret
Represented By: Daniel D Maynard
Represented By: Michael D Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?