Hinton et al v. Completely Innocent LLC
Plaintiff: Jessica Hinton, Jessa Hinton, Claudia Sampedro, Cielo Jean Gibson and Katarina Van Derham
Defendant: Completely Innocent LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Club Luxx
Case Number: 2:2021cv01019
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Cielo Jean Gibson, Jessica Hinton, Claudia Sampedro, Katarina Van Derham: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Preliminary Order upon Tony Herrera, Statutory Agent on 7/12/2021. (Hoffman, Amy)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Cielo Jean Gibson, Jessica Hinton, Claudia Sampedro, Katarina Van Derham. (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(Casas, Joseph)
June 14, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Joseph N Casas, John V Golaszewski on behalf of Plaintiffs Cielo Jean Gibson, Jessica Hinton, Claudia Sampedro, Katarina Van Derham. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on September 9, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/11/2021. (LMR)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Completely Innocent LLC. (JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(JAM)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19558896. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1019-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Cielo Jean Gibson, Jessica Hinton, Claudia Sampedro, Katarina Van Derham. (Hoffman, Amy) (JAM)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19558896 filed by Claudia Sampedro, Jessica Hinton, Katarina Van Derham, Cielo Jean Gibson. (Hoffman, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinton et al v. Completely Innocent LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hinton
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessa Hinton
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Sampedro
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cielo Jean Gibson
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katarina Van Derham
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Completely Innocent LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Club Luxx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?