Campos et al v. Bobby McGee's of Arizona Incorporated
Plaintiff: Jessica Hinton, Claudia Sampedro, Alana Campos, Paige Hathaway, Paola Canas, Iesha Marie Crespo, Carissa Rosario, Jessa Hinton, Brenda Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Jamillette Gaxiola, Andra Cheri Moreland, Rosa Acosta and Eva Pepaj
Defendant: Bobby McGee's of Arizona Incorporated doing business as Q Lounge
Case Number: 2:2021cv01034
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting #15 Application to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Ray Kendall Harris of Fennemore Craig is withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant Bobby McGee's of Arizona Incorporated. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/11/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
August 11, 2021 Filing 16 *Additional attachment to main document (Proposed Order) #15 filed by Bobby McGee's of Arizona Incorporated (Harris, Ray) *Modified text on 8/12/2021 (WLP).
August 11, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bobby McGee's of Arizona Incorporated. (Harris, Ray)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, pursuant to the parties' #13 Stipulation For Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleading, the deadline for Defendant Bobby McGee's of Arizona Incorporated to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended to and including 9/17/2021. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/6/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
August 6, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Bobby McGee's of Arizona Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Stone, Erik)
August 6, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik John Stone on behalf of Bobby McGee's of Arizona Incorporated. (Stone, Erik)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting the #9 Stipulation. Defendant Bobby McGee's of Arizona, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before August 6, 2021. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/15/2021. (LFIG)
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 *NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal filed by Amy Marie Hoffman terminating DeeAnn Marie Barnes. (Hoffman, Amy) *Modified to reflect correct event; attorney noticed on 7/13/2021 (SST).
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Bobby McGee's of Arizona Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Order Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint)(Harris, Ray)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rosa Acosta, Alana Campos, Paola Canas, Iesha Marie Crespo, Jamillette Gaxiola, Brenda Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Paige Hathaway, Jessica Hinton, Andra Cheri Moreland, Eva Pepaj, Carissa Rosario, Claudia Sampedro: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Order upon John Woodrow for Bobby McGee's on 06-17-2021. (Hoffman, Amy)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/15/2021. (RMV)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Rosa Acosta, Alana Campos, Paola Canas, Iesha Marie Crespo, Jamillette Gaxiola, Brenda Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Paige Hathaway, Jessica Hinton, Andra Cheri Moreland, Eva Pepaj, Carissa Rosario, Claudia Sampedro. (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(Casas, Joseph)
June 15, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John V Golaszewski, Joseph N Casas on behalf of Plaintiffs Rosa Acosta, Alana Campos, Paola Canas, Iesha Marie Crespo, Jamillette Gaxiola, Brenda Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Paige Hathaway, Jessica Hinton, Andra Cheri Moreland, Eva Pepaj, Carissa Rosario, Claudia Sampedro. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bobby McGee's of Arizona Incorporated. (ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(ARC)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19565720. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1034-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Rosa Acosta, Alana Campos, Paola Canas, Iesha Marie Crespo, Jamillette Gaxiola, Brenda Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Paige Hathaway, Jessica Hinton, Andra Cheri Moreland, Eva Pepaj, Carissa Rosario, Claudia Sampedro. (Hoffman, Amy) (ARC)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19565720 filed by Cielo Jean Gibson, Paige Hathaway, Andra Cheri Moreland, Claudia Sampedro, Iesha Marie Crespo, Jessica Hinton, Paola Canas, Eva Pepaj, Alana Campos, Brenda Geiger, Rosa Acosta, Jamillette Gaxiola, Carissa Rosario. (Hoffman, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campos et al v. Bobby McGee's of Arizona Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hinton
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Sampedro
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana Campos
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Hathaway
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paola Canas
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iesha Marie Crespo
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carissa Rosario
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessa Hinton
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Geiger
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cielo Jean Gibson
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamillette Gaxiola
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andra Cheri Moreland
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Acosta
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Pepaj
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby McGee's of Arizona Incorporated doing business as Q Lounge
Represented By: Erik John Stone
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?