All The Luv LLC v. Triple B AZ LLC et al
Plaintiff: All The Luv LLC
Defendant: Triple B AZ LLC, Triple B Wings LLC, Triple B Wings 2 LLC, Bryan Ledbetter, ATL Wings Your Way LLC and Anthony Yates a resident of the State of Arizona doing business as ATL Wings Your Way LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01208
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 34 Sealed Exhibit K to #19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by All The Luv LLC. (MAP)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Seal Exhibit. The Clerk is directly to file under seal Exhibit K (Doc. #32 ). Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/8/21. (MAP)
September 8, 2021 Filing 32 *FILED at Doc. #34 *SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit K to PI Memo re: #25 MOTION to Seal Document #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by All The Luv LLC. (Murphy, Bryan) *Modified on 9/8/2021 (MAP).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER pursuant to #30 Stipulation: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED extending Defendants' ATL Wings Your Way LLC and Anthony Yates d/b/a ATL Wings Your Way time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction until September 17, 2021. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/7/21. (MAW)
September 3, 2021 Filing 30 STIPULATION STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS ATL WINGS YOUR WAY LLC AND ANTHONY YATES D/B/A ATL WINGS YOUR WAY TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMIARY INJUNCTION by ATL Wings Your Way LLC, Anthony Yates. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gardner, Bradley)
August 31, 2021 Filing 29 Service Returned Unexecuted by All The Luv LLC : Summons & Complaint as to Bryan Ledbetter. (Murphy, Bryan)
August 31, 2021 Filing 28 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by All The Luv LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon ATL Wings Your Way LLC on 07/28/2021. (Murphy, Bryan)
August 31, 2021 Filing 27 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by All The Luv LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Anthony Yates dba ATL Wings Your Way on 07/28/2021. (Murphy, Bryan)
August 31, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley D Gardner on behalf of ATL Wings Your Way LLC, Anthony Yates. (Gardner, Bradley)
August 30, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Seal Document #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All The Luv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Bryan)
August 26, 2021 Filing 24 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by All The Luv LLC: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 08/25/2021 to ATL Wings Your Way LLC, Anthony Yates d/b/a/ ATL . (Murphy, Bryan)
August 25, 2021 Filing 23 *Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All The Luv LLC Proposed Preliminary Injunction (Murphy, Bryan) *Modified to reflect correct event and to correct docket text on 8/25/2021 (SST).
August 25, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All The Luv LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
August 24, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Triple B AZ, LLC; Triple B Wings, LLC and Triple B Wings 2, LLC by All The Luv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Bryan)
August 24, 2021 Filing 20 *Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #21 MOTION for Default Judgment (Proposed) Judgment by Plaintiff All The Luv LLC. (Murphy, Bryan) *Modified to correct document link on 8/24/2021 (REK).
August 24, 2021 Filing 19 *MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All The Luv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Murphy, Bryan) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation on 8/25/2021 (SST).
August 11, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT by All The Luv LLC. Amendment to #17 Application for Entry of Default First Amended Affidavit of Default. (Murphy, Bryan)
August 11, 2021 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff All The Luv LLC against Triple B Wings, LLC; Triple B Wings 2, LLC; Triple B AZ, LLC. (Murphy, Bryan)
August 10, 2021 Filing 16 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Triple B AZ LLC, Triple B Wings LLC and Triple B Wings 2 LLC. (MHW)
August 9, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff All The Luv LLC against Triple B Wings, LLC; Triple B Wings 2, LLC; Triple B AZ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidaivt of Default)(Murphy, Bryan)
July 23, 2021 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by All The Luv LLC: Certificate of Service re: Initial Case Documents Triple B Wings 2 LLC upon Bronson Ledbetter on 7-16-21. (Murphy, Bryan)
July 23, 2021 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by All The Luv LLC: Certificate of Service re: Initial Case Documents Triple B Wings, LLC upon Bronson Ledbetter on 7-16-21. (Murphy, Bryan)
July 23, 2021 Filing 12 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by All The Luv LLC: Certificate of Service: Initial Case Documents Triple B AZ LLC upon Bronson Ledbetter on 7-16-21. (Murphy, Bryan) *Modified to reflect correct event and to correct docket text; attorney noticed on 7/26/2021 (SST).
July 21, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to ATL Wings Your Way LLC, Anthony Yates. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 20, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by All The Luv LLC. (Murphy, Bryan)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by All The Luv LLC. (Murphy, Bryan)
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Bryan Ledbetter, Triple B AZ LLC, Triple B Wings 2 LLC, Triple B Wings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by All The Luv LLC. (Murphy, Bryan) (DLC)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Trademark Information by All The Luv LLC. (Murphy, Bryan) (DLC)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(DLC)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19656419. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1208-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by All The Luv LLC. (Murphy, Bryan) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(DLC)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by All The Luv LLC. (Murphy, Bryan) (DLC)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19656419 filed by All The Luv LLC. (Murphy, Bryan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All The Luv LLC v. Triple B AZ LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All The Luv LLC
Represented By: Albert Lee Underhill
Represented By: Bryan F Murphy
Represented By: Laura Jean Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple B AZ LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple B Wings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple B Wings 2 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATL Wings Your Way LLC
Represented By: Bradley D Gardner
Represented By: David R Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Yates a resident of the State of Arizona doing business as ATL Wings Your Way LLC
Represented By: Bradley D Gardner
Represented By: David R Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?