Varxity Development Corporation v. Payson, Town of
Plaintiff: Varxity Development Corporation
Defendant: Payson, Town of
Case Number: 2:2021cv01216
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Payson, Town of. (Mackin, Kristin)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Defendant shall have until September 9, 2021, to file a Reply to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/31/21. (SJF)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Response to Motion, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #12 Notice of Errata Unopposed by Payson, Town of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Extend Motion to Dismiss Reply)(Mackin, Kristin)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Varxity Development Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Response to Motion to Dismiss)(Froderman, Troy)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Errata re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re Motion to Dismiss Exhibits by Defendant Payson, Town of.. (Mackin, Kristin)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE re: Certification re LRCiv12(c) by Payson, Town of re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Mackin, Kristin)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Payson, Town of. (Mackin, Kristin)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 *PRELIMINARY ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: That Plaintiff must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than October 11, 2021; That Plaintiff must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendantand file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; and That unless the Court orders otherwise, on October 11, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 07/13/2021. (MHW) *Modified to correct text on 7/14/2021 (MHW).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Varxity Development Corporation. (Froderman, Troy)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Payson, Town of. (REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19659265. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P. Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01216-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Varxity Development Corporation. (Froderman, Troy) (REM)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Varxity Development Corporation. (REM)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Varxity Development Corporation. (Froderman, Troy)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Varxity Development Corporation. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REM)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19659265 filed by Varxity Development Corporation.(Froderman, Troy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varxity Development Corporation v. Payson, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varxity Development Corporation
Represented By: John Frederick Barwell
Represented By: Richard John Edwards
Represented By: Scott Corey Ryan
Represented By: Troy Blinn Froderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payson, Town of
Represented By: Kristin Marie Mackin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?