Arizona, State of v. $8,025.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: Arizona, State of
Defendant: $8,025.00 in U.S. Currency, $6,000.00 in U.S. Currency, 1134 W Glenrosa Ave, Phoenix, AZ 85013 and Body Armor, Black
Claimant: Sun West Mortgage Company Incorporated and Clay Lindell Villanueva
Case Number: 2:2021cv01278
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the amended stipulation to extend time (Doc. #13 ) is granted as follows: Claimant shall respond to the motion to remand by 9/27/2021; Claimant shall reply in support of his motion to dismiss by 10/4/2021. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 9/9/2021. (RMW)
September 3, 2021 Filing 13 *Amended STIPULATION re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Clay Lindell Villanueva. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, John) *Modified to add "amended" on 9/8/2021 (appears to be amended version of Doc. 12 - amended to include plaintiff's signature) (SST).
September 3, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Clay Lindell Villanueva. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, John)
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction State of Arizona's Response to Defendant Clay Villanueva's Motion to Dismiss Removed Forfeiture Complaint filed by Arizona, State of. (Makar, Robert)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 *NOTICE re: Of Related Case 20-2373-ROS by Clay Lindell Villanueva . (Sullivan, John) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation; attorney noticed on 8/25/2021 (SST).
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Arizona, State of. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Thomas Rankin and Exhibits A-B, #2 Proposed Order)(Makar, Robert)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the "motion to substitute" (Doc. #7 ) is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall update the docket to reflect that claimant Clay Lindell Villanueva is now represented by John William Sullivan. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 8/19/2021. (RMW)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 *MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Clay Lindell Villanueva. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, John) *Modified on 8/17/2021 to remove ex parte designation (KAH).
August 16, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John William Sullivan on behalf of Claimant Clay Lindell Villanueva. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Clay Lindell Villanueva. (12 pages) (ESG)
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Clay Lindell Villanueva. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAS)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Errata re: #1 Notice of Removal by Claimant Clay Lindell Villanueva. (SST) (3 pages)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX230547. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A. Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01278-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-007240. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number PHX230547 filed by Clay Lindell Villanueva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAS)
July 23, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED 07/23/2021*** CLAIM by Clay Lindell Villanueva.***FILED IN STATE COURT ON 05/03/2021, docketed in U.S. District Court on 7/23/2021 for case management purposes.*** (BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona, State of v. $8,025.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Mukai Amoo
Represented By: Robert John Makar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,025.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1134 W Glenrosa Ave, Phoenix, AZ 85013
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Body Armor, Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sun West Mortgage Company Incorporated
Represented By: Scott Evan Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Clay Lindell Villanueva
Represented By: John William Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?