Keul et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Keul and Tricia Keul
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Incorporated, Ethicon Incorporated, Ethicon LLC, Ethicon Endo-Surgery Incorporated and Ethicon Endo-Surgery LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01330
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #24 ), Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
September 10, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jeffrey Keul, Tricia Keul. (Stoller, Paul)
August 30, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Case For Insufficient Service of Process by Ethicon Endo-Surgery Incorporated, Ethicon Endo-Surgery LLC, Ethicon Incorporated, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 - 2)(Moskow, Kenneth)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: On August 23, 2021, Defendants filed an amended notice of removal. (Doc. #21 .) The Court is satisfied that subject matter jurisdiction exists. Pursuant to Rule 81(c)(2)(C), Defendants shall respond to the complaint by August 30, 2021. The parties' stipulation to extend that deadline to August 13, 2021 (Doc. #15 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/24/21. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
August 23, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE re: Amended Notice of Removal by Ethicon Endo-Surgery Incorporated, Ethicon Endo-Surgery LLC, Ethicon Incorporated, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Incorporated . (Moskow, Kenneth)
August 18, 2021 Filing 20 *NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' Filing of Non-Service Declaration by Jeffrey Keul, Tricia Keul . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Non-Service Declaration)(Stoller, Paul) *Document not in compliance with Local Rule, attorney noticed on 8/19/2021 (LAD).
August 18, 2021 Filing 19 *STATEMENT of Statement of Domicile by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Keul, Tricia Keul. (Stoller, Paul) *Document not in compliance with Local Rule, attorney noticed on 8/19/2021 (LAD).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a notice informing the Court of their state of domicile by August 16, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file an amended notice of removal properly stating a jurisdictional basis for this action no later than August 23, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendants fail to file an amended notice of removal by August 23, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall remand this action to state court without further notice [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/9/21. (MAW)
August 9, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Dominic W Lanza. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-1330-PHX-DWL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 6, 2021 Filing 16 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 6, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Extend DEF Responsive Pleading Deadline by Ethicon Endo-Surgery Incorporated, Ethicon Endo-Surgery LLC, Ethicon Incorporated, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moskow, Kenneth)
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Paul Lincoln Stoller. (Stoller, Paul)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 *AMENDED DOCUMENT re: #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Incorporated (Alexander, Donn) *Modified text and to add link on 8/4/2021 (WLP).
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 *AMENDED DOCUMENT re: #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ethicon Incorporated. (Alexander, Donn) *Modified text and added link on 8/4/2021 (WLP).
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 *AMENDED DOCUMENT re: #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ethicon Endo-Surgery Incorporated (Alexander, Donn) *Modified text and added link on 8/4/2021 (WLP).
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ethicon Endo-Surgery LLC. (Alexander, Donn)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ethicon Incorporated. (Alexander, Donn)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ethicon Endo-Surgery LLC. (Alexander, Donn)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ethicon Endo-Surgery Incorporated. (Alexander, Donn)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Incorporated. (Alexander, Donn)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson. (Alexander, Donn)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Ethicon Endo-Surgery Incorporated, Ethicon Endo-Surgery LLC, Ethicon Incorporated, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Incorporated. (ARC)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19720619. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1330-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (ARC)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-004917. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19720619 filed by Ethicon LLC, Ethicon Endo-Surgery LLC, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon Endo-Surgery Incorporated, Ethicon Incorporated. (Alexander, Donn) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(ARC)
July 30, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : re: Summons, Original Complaint upon Ethicon Endo-Surgery Incorporated on 7/2/2021. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 7/27/2021); upon Ethicon LLC on 7/2/2021. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 7/27/2021); upon Ethicon Incorporated on 7/2/2021. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 7/27/2021); Upon Johnson & Johnson Consumer Incorporated on 7/2/2021. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 7/27/2021) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keul et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Keul
Represented By: Ashley Crowell
Represented By: Ellen A Presby
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia Keul
Represented By: Ashley Crowell
Represented By: Ellen A Presby
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Donn Christopher Alexander
Represented By: Kenneth Louis Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Incorporated
Represented By: Donn Christopher Alexander
Represented By: Kenneth Louis Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Incorporated
Represented By: Donn Christopher Alexander
Represented By: Kenneth Louis Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: Donn Christopher Alexander
Represented By: Kenneth Louis Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Endo-Surgery Incorporated
Represented By: Donn Christopher Alexander
Represented By: Kenneth Louis Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Endo-Surgery LLC
Represented By: Donn Christopher Alexander
Represented By: Kenneth Louis Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?