Blazek v. Heavens Urgent Care LLC et al
Plaintiff: Daltina Blazek
Defendant: Heavens Urgent Care LLC, Roxanne Heavens and Jason P Heavens
Case Number: 2:2021cv01425
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2021 at 02:30 PM. Plaintiff's counsel shall set up a call-in number and include the information in the joint report due a week before the scheduling conference. See document for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/24/2021. (REK)
September 24, 2021 Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jason P Heavens, Roxanne Heavens, Heavens Urgent Care LLC.(Gardner, Bradley)
September 15, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Heavens Urgent Care LLC. (Gardner, Bradley)
September 15, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Heavens Urgent Care LLC. (KFZ)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Heavens Urgent Care LLC, Roxanne Heavens and Jason P. Heavens have until 9/24/2021, to file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/14/2021. (KFZ)
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Jason P Heavens, Roxanne Heavens, Heavens Urgent Care LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gardner, Bradley)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Daltina Blazek: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint Civil Cover Sheet, Order, upon Heavens Urgent Care LLC on 9/3/21. (Frankel, Ty)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Daltina Blazek: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint Civil Cover Sheet, Order, upon Roxanne Heavens on 9/01/2021. (Frankel, Ty) *Modified to correct date of service on 9/9/2021 (REK).
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Daltina Blazek: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint Civil Cover Sheet, Order, upon Jason P. Heavens on 9/01/2021. (Frankel, Ty) *Modified to correct date of service on 9/9/2021 (REK).
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley D Gardner on behalf of Jason P Heavens, Roxanne Heavens, Heavens Urgent Care LLC. (Gardner, Bradley)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED if any Defendants file a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) or 12(c) and if Plaintiff contends any further amendment of her Complaint #1 can cure any alleged deficiency, Plaintiff must submit, no later than the time she files a response to a motion to dismiss, a proposed amended complaint containing all further allegations Plaintiff could make. FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event a motion to dismiss is granted in any part, no leave will be granted to amend the Complaint beyond what is offered in that proposed amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/19/2021. (KFZ)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 11/16/2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/19/2021. (KFZ)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jason P Heavens, Roxanne Heavens, Heavens Urgent Care LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19775337. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1425-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Daltina Blazek. (Frankel, Ty) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JAM)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19775337 filed by Daltina Blazek. (Frankel, Ty) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blazek v. Heavens Urgent Care LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daltina Blazek
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Ty Derek Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heavens Urgent Care LLC
Represented By: Bradley D Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne Heavens
Represented By: Bradley D Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason P Heavens
Represented By: Bradley D Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?