Wilkerson v. Walgreens Specialty Pharmacy LLC et al
Plaintiff: Andrea Wilkerson
Defendant: Walgreens Specialty Pharmacy LLC doing business as AllianceRX Walgreens Prime and Healthcare Support Staffing Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv01427
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Andrea Wilkerson: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Walgreens Specialty Pharmacy, LLC d/b/a AllianceRX Walgreens Prime on 10/05/2021. (Rusch, Jacob)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Andrea Wilkerson: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Healthcare Support Staffing, Inc on 10/05/2021. (Rusch, Jacob)
September 1, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Zackary S Kaylor, Jacob R Rusch on behalf of Plaintiff Andrea Wilkerson. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDARD CIVIL TRACK INITIAL ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff must file a notice within 7 days of any Defendant answering (or, in a removed case, within 7 days of removal if any Defendant answered prior to removal) that the parties are ready for a Rule 16 scheduling conference. The Court will issue an order setting a Rule 16 conference. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/18/2021. (LAD)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Healthcare Support Staffing Incorporated, Walgreens Specialty Pharmacy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19774936. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1427-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Andrea Wilkerson. (Traulsen, Richard) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JAM)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19774936 filed by Andrea Wilkerson. (Traulsen, Richard) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkerson v. Walgreens Specialty Pharmacy LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Wilkerson
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Jacob R Rusch
Represented By: Zackary S Kaylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Specialty Pharmacy LLC doing business as AllianceRX Walgreens Prime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Support Staffing Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?