Teter v. Weaver Leather LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Teter
Defendant: Weaver Leather LLC, eBay Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2021cv01445
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Weaver Leather LLC. (Ashley, Robert)
September 30, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Weaver Leather LLC. (Ashley, Robert)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER issued: Discovery due by 6/8/2022. Dispositive motions due by 6/22/2022. See Order for full details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/27/21. (SJF)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that the Rule 16 Case Management Conference, presently set for October 5, 2021 before Honorable Steven P. Logan, is vacated. Order to follow. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/27/21. (SJF)
September 24, 2021 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by John Teter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tonkin, Timothy)
September 1, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE re: of Service of Order by John Teter . (Tonkin, Timothy)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER issued: Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. The parties shall jointly develop and file with the Clerk of Court no later than September 24, 2021, each of the following in the form outlined below: (1) a Joint Rule 26(f) Case Management Report, and (2) a Joint Proposed Rule 16 Case Management Order. See Order for further details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/31/21. (Attachments: #1 Rule 16 CMO) (SJF)
August 27, 2021 Filing 15 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Weaver Leather LLC. (Ashley, Robert)
August 27, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Weaver Leather LLC.(Ashley, Robert)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER governing these proceedings issued. See Order for details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/26/21. (SJF)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weaver Leather LLC. (Ashley, Robert)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-1445-PHX-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 7 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only), #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Weaver Leather LLC. (Ashley, Robert)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 Additional Attachments to Main Document filed by Weaver Leather LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. The form that was submitted is not utilized by the District of Arizona. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit the automated JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet that is located on our website: www.azd.uscourts.gov under the Rules, General Orders, and Forms category. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal, 4 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) by Defendant Weaver Leather LLC. (Ashley, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Weaver Leather LLC. (BAC)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Weaver Leather LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile the Civil Cover Sheet in the correct format. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Weaver Leather LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19786329. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01445-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (BAC)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-011255. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0970-19786329 filed by Weaver Leather LLC. (Ashley, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibits A-k)(BAC)
August 20, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon eBay Incorporated C/O Christine Napier, clerk for CT Corporation System as Statutory Agent on 7/20/21(original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 7/22/21); Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Weaver Leather LLC C/O Deanne Scnauseil, Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent on 7/21/21(original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 8/21/21). (BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teter v. Weaver Leather LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Teter
Represented By: Nasser Usama Abujbarah
Represented By: Timothy Gary Tonkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weaver Leather LLC
Represented By: Robert Charles Ashley
Represented By: Sean Patrick Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay Incorporated
Represented By: Lori Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?