Doughty-Sowah v. North Central Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lorena Doughty-Sowah
Defendant: North Central Group LLC doing business as Residence Inn By Marriott Phoenix North/Happy Valley, Residence Inn by Marriott LLC doing business as Residence Inn by Marriott Phoenix North/Happy Valley, Unknown Parties and North Central Management Incorporated doing business as Residence Inn by Marriott Phoenix North/Happy Valley
Case Number: 2:2021cv01527
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by North Central Management Incorporated. (Sokolova, Ekaterina)
October 25, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by North Central Management Incorporated. (Sokolova, Ekaterina)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/30/2022. Dispositive motions due by 8/5/2022 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/20/21. (MAW)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties' joint Rule 26(f) report (Doc. #15 ), concludes it is unnecessary to hold a Rule 16 Case Management Conference. The Court will separately issue the Case Management Order. Counsel are to note at Item 12 of the Case Management Order that the deadlines are real, and the Court will enforce the deadlines set forth in the Order. The parties should plan their litigation activities accordingly. The Court has also reviewed the parties' request to amend the case caption but declines to do so. See Hoemke v. Macy's West Stores LLC, 2020 WL 5229194, *1 (D. Ariz. 2020) (denying stipulated motion to amend the case caption and noting that "[o]bvious reasons for requiring that a caption be maintained consistently throughout the entirety of an action include organizational matters, ease of reference, and case cohesion for posterity"). Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/20/21. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the application to substitute counsel (Doc. #14 ) is granted. Christopher J. Zachar of Zachar Law Firm, P.C., is substituted in place of Jacob Podolsky of Schenk Podolsky as counsel of record for Lorena Doughty-Sowah. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/19/21. (SMH)
October 18, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lorena Doughty-Sowah. (Zachar, Christopher)
October 18, 2021 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Lorena Doughty-Sowah. (Zachar, Christopher)
October 18, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Lorena Doughty-Sowah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Substitution)(Zachar, Christopher)
October 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Zachar on behalf of Lorena Doughty-Sowah. (Zachar, Christopher)
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED DOCUMENT by North Central Management Incorporated. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Sokolova, Ekaterina)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Preliminary Order by Lorena Doughty-Sowah . (Podolsky, Jacob)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court will issue a scheduling order after receiving the parties' Rule 26(f) report. After reviewing the Rule 26(f) report, the Court will set a case management conference if meeting with the parties appears necessary or helpful. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED as follows: The parties are directed to meet, confer, and develop a Rule 26(f) Joint Case Management Report, which must be filed no later than October 19, 2021 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 9/21/21. (MAW)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on December 7, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 9/21/21. (MAW)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE re: Notice of Plaintiff's Domicile by Lorena Doughty-Sowah . (Podolsky, Jacob)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a notice informing the Court of her state of domicile within 7 days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file an amended notice of removal properly stating a jurisdictional basis for this action within 14 days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant fails to file an amended notice of removal within 14 days, the Clerk of Court shall remand this action to state court without further notice [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 9/16/21. (MAW)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by North Central Management Incorporated. (Sokolova, Ekaterina)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by North Central Management Incorporated.(Sokolova, Ekaterina)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by North Central Management Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent North Central Group, Inc. for North Central Management Incorporated. (Sokolova, Ekaterina)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to North Central Management Incorporated. (JAM)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19839096. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1527-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-093268. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19839096 filed by North Central Management Incorporated. (Sokolova, Ekaterina) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(JAM)
September 7, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Rule 4 Waiver of Process and Acceptance of Service, signed by Kate Sokolova on 8/23/21. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 8/25/21.)SERVICE EXECUTED: Service of Process re: Summons, Certificate, Complaint upon C T Corporation System on 7/21/21 for Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 7/22/21.) (JAM) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doughty-Sowah v. North Central Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena Doughty-Sowah
Represented By: Jacob Ross Podolsky
Represented By: Christopher J Zachar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Central Group LLC doing business as Residence Inn By Marriott Phoenix North/Happy Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residence Inn by Marriott LLC doing business as Residence Inn by Marriott Phoenix North/Happy Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Central Management Incorporated doing business as Residence Inn by Marriott Phoenix North/Happy Valley
Represented By: Ekaterina Sokolova
Represented By: Garrick L Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?