Lerner & Rowe PC v. Brown Engstrand & Shelly LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lerner & Rowe PC
Defendant: Brown Engstrand & Shelly LLC an Arizona corporation doing business as Accident Law Group, Joseph L Brown and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2021cv01540
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re: #21 MOTION to Join Google as a Party Under Rule 19 filed by Lerner & Rowe PC. (Gaggin, Andrew)
October 21, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Errata re: #21 MOTION to Join Google as a Party Under Rule 19 by Defendants Joseph L Brown, Brown Engstrand & Shelly LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Meyer, Ross)
October 20, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joseph L Brown, Brown Engstrand & Shelly LLC. (Meyer, Ross)
October 20, 2021 Filing 21 *MOTION to Join Google as a Party Under Rule 19 Pursuant to FRCP 12b7 by Joseph L Brown, Brown Engstrand & Shelly LLC. (Meyer, Ross) *Modified to correct motion type and text on 10/21/2021 (REK).
October 12, 2021 Filing 20 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lerner & Rowe PC: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Joseph Brown on September 30, 2021. (Gaggin, Andrew) *Modified to correct service date on 10/13/2021 (REK).
October 12, 2021 Filing 19 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lerner & Rowe PC: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Brown Engstrand & Shelly LLC on September 30, 2021. (Gaggin, Andrew) *Modified to correct service date on 10/13/2021 (REK).
September 29, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Joseph L Brown, Brown Engstrand & Shelly LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 28, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Submitted by Lerner & Rowe PC. (Gaggin, Andrew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Submitted by Lerner & Rowe PC. (Gaggin, Andrew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #14 Summons Submitted filed by Lerner & Rowe PC, #13 Summons Submitted filed by Lerner & Rowe PC. Defendant name on both submitted summonses does not match docket or complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 27, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Submitted by Lerner & Rowe PC. (Gaggin, Andrew)
September 27, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Submitted by Lerner & Rowe PC. (Gaggin, Andrew)
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #11 Summons Submitted filed by Lerner & Rowe PC. Defendant name does not match docket. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Submitted by Lerner & Rowe PC. (Gaggin, Andrew)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Summons Submitted filed by Lerner & Rowe PC. Two defendants listed on summons. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit one summons per defendant. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Lerner & Rowe PC. (Gaggin, Andrew)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lerner & Rowe PC. (Gaggin, Andrew)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Lerner & Rowe PC. (Gaggin, Andrew)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 12(b). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/9/21. (MJF)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(REM)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19841748. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01540-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Lerner & Rowe PC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REM)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days.Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Lerner & Rowe PC. (REM)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19841748filed by Lerner & Rowe PC.(Gaggin, Andrew) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lerner & Rowe PC v. Brown Engstrand & Shelly LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lerner & Rowe PC
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gaggin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown Engstrand & Shelly LLC an Arizona corporation doing business as Accident Law Group
Represented By: Brian J Foster
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Represented By: Ross Preston Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph L Brown
Represented By: Brian J Foster
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Represented By: Ross Preston Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?