Madluvv LLC v. Brow Trio LLC et al
Defendant: Briana Olson and Neils Olson
Counter Defendant: Madluvv LLC
Counter Claimant: Brow Trio LLC and La Perma Artistry LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01683
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a supplement to the motion to continue (Doc. #19 ) by 11/29/2021 addressing the issues set forth in the attached order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stipulation to dismiss Defendants Briana Olson and Neils Olson (Doc. #20 ) is granted. Defendants Briana Olson and Neils Olson (only) are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 11/19/2021. (RMW)
November 19, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendants Briana Olson and Neils Olson by Madluvv LLC. (Udall, Nathan)
November 19, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Request for Remote Appearance by Madluvv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Udall, Nathan)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Defendants Briana Olson and Neils Olson's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint (Doc. #17 ) is granted such that they shall respond to the complaint by 11/29/2021. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 11/15/2021. (RMW)
November 11, 2021 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Briana Olson, Neils Olson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crum, Isaac)
November 11, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Brow Trio LLC, La Perma Artistry LLC. (Sitrick, Gregory)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 12/15/2021 at 02:30 PM, in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003. Counsel shall jointly file their Proposed Case Management Plan with the Clerk of the Court not less than ten (10) days before the Scheduling Conference. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 11/9/2021. (RMW)
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #13 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (WLP)
November 6, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Madluvv LLC by La Perma Artistry LLC, Brow Trio LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Crum, Isaac)
November 1, 2021 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Madluvv LLC: Return of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Orders upon The Brow Trio, LLC on 10/21/2021. (Udall, Nathan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Madluvv LLC: Return of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Orders upon La Perma Artistry, LLC on 10/21/2021. (Udall, Nathan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Madluvv LLC: Return of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Orders upon Briana Olson on 10/21/2021. (Udall, Nathan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Madluvv LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Orders upon Neils Olson on 10/21/2021. (Udall, Nathan)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Madluvv LLC. (Udall, Nathan)
October 7, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Douglas F Hartman on behalf of Plaintiff Madluvv LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDARD CIVIL TRACK INITIAL ORDER (See document for full details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/01/2021. (REK)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Brow Trio LLC, La Perma Artistry LLC, Briana Olson, Neils Olson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(JAM)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19923276. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1683-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Madluvv LLC. (Udall, Nathan) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(JAM)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Madluvv LLC. (Udall, Nathan) (JAM)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19923276 filed by Madluvv LLC. (Udall, Nathan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madluvv LLC v. Brow Trio LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Madluvv LLC
Represented By: Brad Alan Denton
Represented By: Douglas F Hartman
Represented By: Nathan Tyler Udall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Brow Trio LLC
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Sitrick
Represented By: Isaac Scott Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: La Perma Artistry LLC
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Sitrick
Represented By: Isaac Scott Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briana Olson
Represented By: Isaac Scott Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neils Olson
Represented By: Isaac Scott Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?