Kwintkiewicz v. Whats Up LLC
Plaintiff: Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz doing business as Katten Nails
Defendant: Whats Up LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01843
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz: Affidavit of Service re: Order Granting Alternative Service; Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint; Exhibits upon Whats up LLC on 12/14/2021. (Sanders, Craig)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall be permitted to effect service on Defendant Whats Up LLC by alternative means, to wit: serving the summons and complaint via certified mail to the Statutory address and by affixing a copy of the Summons and Complaint to the front door of the Statutory Address. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the deadline for service of Defendant shall be February 2, 2022. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/8/21. (SMH)
December 7, 2021 Filing 12 *MOTION for Extension of Time TO SERVICE PER FED. R. CIV. P 4(m) and TO ALLOW SERVICE BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS by Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Sanders, Craig). *Added MOTION part on 12/8/2021. (SMH)
November 18, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Craig B Sanders on behalf of Plaintiff Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/3/2021. (RMV)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Having been issued in error, Judge Susan M Brnovich is no longer assigned to this case. Judge Douglas L Rayes has been randomly reassigned. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1843-PHX-DLR. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. (Sanders, Craig)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. (MYE)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Whats Up LLC. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. (Sanders, Craig) (MYE)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MYE)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20028929. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1843-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of a Related Action by Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. (Sanders, Craig) (MYE)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. (Sanders, Craig) (MYE)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20028929 filed by Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. (Sanders, Craig) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kwintkiewicz v. Whats Up LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz doing business as Katten Nails
Represented By: Craig B Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whats Up LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?